EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *hb0889* HOUSE BILL 889 C2, Q1 3lr2796 By: Delegate Ruth Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2023 Assigned to: Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Retail Service Stations – Electric Vehicle Charging Stations and Property Tax 2 Credit for Service Station Conversions 3 FOR the purpose of requiring, for the approval of a new retail service station on or after a 4 certain date, the person constructing the station to install at the station a certain 5 number of electric vehicle charging stations; authorizing the Mayor and City Council 6 of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, 7 by law, a credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on 8 real property if use of the real property has been converted from a retail service 9 station to other certain uses; requiring the State to pay to each county or municipal 10 corporation that grants the property tax credit under this Act an amount equal to a 11 certain percentage of certain foregone revenue of the county or municipal 12 corporation; and generally relating to retail service stations. 13 BY adding to 14 Article – Business Regulation 15 Section 10–504 16 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 18 BY adding to 19 Article – Tax – Property 20 Section 9–268 21 Annotated Code of Maryland 22 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 23 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 24 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 25 Article – Business Regulation 26 2 HOUSE BILL 889 10–504. 1 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 2 INDICATED. 3 (2) “APPROVING BODY ” MEANS A COUNTY OR MUNICIPALITY THAT 4 EXERCISES FINAL CONS TRUCTION APPROVAL AU THORITY FOR RETAIL S ERVICE 5 STATIONS. 6 (3) “ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHAR GING STATION ” HAS THE MEANING 7 STATED IN § 12–205 OF THE PUBLIC SAFETY ARTICLE. 8 (4) “FAST CHARGING ” MEANS DIRECT CURRENT CHARGING THAT 9 CAN PROVIDE A MINIMU M OF 150 KILOWATTS OF POWER T O AN ELECTRIC VEHICL E. 10 (5) “FINAL CONSTRUCTION AP PROVAL” MEANS FINAL APPROVAL BY 11 AN APPROVING BODY TO CONSTRUCT A RETAIL S ERVICE STATION . 12 (B) THIS SECTION DOES NOT APPLY TO A RETAIL SE RVICE STATION THAT 13 RECEIVED FINAL CONST RUCTION APPROVAL FRO M AN APPROVING BODY BEFORE 14 OCTOBER 1, 2023. 15 (C) (1) ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2023, A PERSON CONSTRUCTIN G A 16 RETAIL SERVICE STATI ON THAT IS PROJECTED TO SELL MORE THAN 1,000,000 17 GALLONS OF GASOLINE PER YEAR SHALL INSTA LL ONE ELECTRIC VEHI CLE 18 CHARGING STATION CAP ABLE OF PROVIDING FAST CHARGING FOR EACH GASOLINE 19 DISPENSER OPERATED BY THE RETA IL SERVICE STATION . 20 (2) THE INSTALLATION OF A N ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING 21 STATION REQUIRED UND ER THIS SUBSECTION M UST BE PERFORMED BY AN 22 INDIVIDUAL WHO IS CE RTIFIED BY THE ELECTRIC VEHICLE INFRASTRUCTURE 23 TRAINING PROGRAM TO INSTALL EL ECTRIC VEHICLE SUPPL Y EQUIPMENT. 24 (D) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2024, EACH APPROVING BOD Y SHALL 25 ADOPT REGULATIONS TO CARRY OUT THIS SECTI ON. 26 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 27 as follows: 28 Article – Tax – Property 29 9–268. 30 HOUSE BILL 889 3 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 1 INDICATED. 2 (2) “DISCOUNT STORE ” MEANS A RETAIL STORE THAT OFFERS FOR 3 SALE: 4 (I) A COMBINATION AND VA RIETY OF CONVENIENCE AND 5 CONSUMER SHOPPING GO ODS; AND 6 (II) THE MAJORITY OF THE ITEMS IN THE INVENTO RY AT A 7 PRICE NOT TO EXCEED $5. 8 (3) “RETAIL USE” DOES NOT INCLUDE USE AS A DISCOUNT ST ORE OR 9 A SELF–SERVICE STORAGE FACI LITY. 10 (B) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 11 GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATION MAY GRAN T, BY LAW, 12 A PROPERTY TAX CREDI T UNDER THIS SECTION AGAINST THE COUNTY O R 13 MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N PROPERTY TAX IMPOS ED ON REAL PROPERTY IF THE USE 14 OF THE REAL PROPERTY HAS BEEN CONVERTED F ROM A RETAIL SERVICE STATI ON 15 TO ANOTHER RETAIL US E, A RESIDENTIAL USE , OR A MIXED RETAIL AND 16 RESIDENTIAL USE . 17 (C) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL O F BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 18 GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATION MAY PROV IDE, BY 19 LAW, FOR: 20 (1) THE AMOUNT AND DURAT ION OF THE TAX CREDI T UNDER THIS 21 SECTION; 22 (2) ADDITIONAL ELIGIBILI TY CRITERIA FOR THE TAX CREDIT; 23 (3) REGULATIONS AND PRO CEDURES FOR THE APPL ICATION AND 24 UNIFORM PROCESSING O F REQUESTS FOR THE T AX CREDIT; AND 25 (4) ANY OTHER PROVISION NECESSARY TO CARRY O UT THE TAX 26 CREDIT UNDER THIS SE CTION. 27 (D) AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET , THE STATE SHALL PAY TO EACH 28 COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N THAT GRANTS THE TAX CREDIT UNDER THIS 29 SECTION AN AMOUNT EQUAL TO 50% OF THE PROPERTY TAX REVENUE THAT WOULD 30 HAVE BEEN COLLECTED IF THE TAX CREDIT UN DER THIS SECTION HAD NOT BEEN 31 GRANTED. 32 4 HOUSE BILL 889 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Se ction 2 of this Act shall be 1 applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2023. 2 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 3 effect October 1, 2023. 4 SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , except as provided in Section 5 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2023. 6