House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (103-37) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (31-11) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {803025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (99-36) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113023/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |