House
|
05/16/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {763129/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {763129/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee Amendment {783221/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {313524/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading Appropriations
|
|
|