Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |