House
|
03/13/2023
|
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {583826/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {823429/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {893227/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {893227/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {993223/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {233721/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {233721/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {233721/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2023
|
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2022
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|