Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB18 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/07/2023

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0018*  
  
SENATE BILL 18 
E4   	3lr0965 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 308 
By: Senator West Senators West and Hester, Hester, Salling, and Carozza 
Requested: November 19, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: March 1, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning  1 
 
Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup to study 3 
issues and factors potentially contributing to the decline in police retention 4 
statewide; and generally relating to the Police Recruitment and Retention 5 
Workgroup. 6 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 7 
That: 8 
 
 (a) There is a Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup. 9 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 10 
 
 (1) two members of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 11 
the Senate; 12 
 
 (2) two members of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of 13 
the House; 14 
 
 (3) the Secretary of the Department of State Police, or the Secretary’s 15 
designee; 16 
 
 (4) the Public Defender, or the Public Defender’s designee; 17  2 	SENATE BILL 18  
 
 
 
 (5) the Attorney General, or the Attorney General’s designee;  1 
 
 (6) the President of the Maryland State’s Attorneys’ Association, or the 2 
President’s designee;  3 
 
 (7) the President of the Maryland Chiefs of Police Association, or the 4 
President’s designee; 5 
 
 (7) (8) one member with expertise in the field of effective policing, designated 6 
by the President of the Fraternal Order of Police; and 7 
 
 (8) (9) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 8 
 
 (i) one representative of the Fraternal Order of Police; 9 
 
 (ii) one representative from the American Civil Liberties Union; and 10 
 
 (ii) one representative from the Maryland Sheriffs’ Association;  11 
 
 (iii) one representative from the Maryland Chiefs of Police 12 
Association; 13 
 
 (iv) one representative from Law Enforcement Action Partnership, 14 
Inc.; 15 
 
 (v) one representative from the Vanguard Justice Society, Inc.;  16 
 
 (vi) one representative from the National Association for the 17 
Advancement of Colored People; and  18 
 
 (iii) (vii) one citizen representative; 19 
 
 (9) (10) the following members, appointed by the Maryland Association 20 
of Counties:  21 
 
 (i) one representative of a police department for an urban county; 22 
and  23 
 
 (ii) one representative of a sheriff’s office for a rural county; and  24 
 
 (10) (11) the following members, appointed by the Maryland Municipal 25 
League: 26 
 
 (i) one representative of a police department for an urban 27 
municipality; and 28 
   	SENATE BILL 18 	3 
 
 
 (ii) one representative of a police department for a rural 1 
municipality. 2 
 
 (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Workgroup. 3 
 
 (d) The Department of State Police shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 4 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 5 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 6 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 7 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 8 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall identify and examine issues and factors potentially 9 
contributing to recruitment challenges and the decline in police officer retention statewide, 10 
including: 11 
 
 (1) the number of police officers retiring annually; 12 
 
 (2) the number of cadets completing police academy training annually; 13 
 
 (3) current salary ranges for police officers statewide; 14 
 
 (4) current retirement and health benefits and, pension programs, and 15 
other fringe benefits available to police officers; 16 
 
 (5) training hour requirements for police officers; 17 
 
 (6) police training academy acceptance requirements; 18 
 
 (7) recruitment techniques; 19 
 
 (8) requirements for advancement within police departments; and 20 
 
 (9) the impact of current State and local laws on policing and police 21 
departments; 22 
 
 (10) to the extent that information is available:  23 
 
 (i) the migration of police officers between departments;  24 
 
 (ii) the attrition rates of newly certified police officers; 25 
  
 (iii) the average length of active service for police officers; and  26 
  4 	SENATE BILL 18  
 
 
 (iv) the number of actively employed police officers who have retired 1 
from another police department in State or local government; and 2 
 
 (11) perceptions of the occupation among potential recruits.  3 
 
 (g) The Workgroup shall explore:  4 
 
 (1) recruitment and retention strategies used successfully in other states 5 
and countries; and  6 
 
 (2) design a statewide joint apprenticeship and training council including 7 
multiple departments and unions to operate a police registered apprenticeship beginning 8 
in high school. 9 
 
 (g) (h) On or before December 30, 2024, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 10 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 11 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 12 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER EN ACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 13 
1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2025, 14 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 15 
of no further force and effect. 16 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.