Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {273528/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |