Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/28/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Finance |