House | 04/08/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {183223/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/15/2023 | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Reassigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 09/09/2022 | Pre-filed |