Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (128-5) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {153726/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {963123/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |