Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {343921/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 8:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |