Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Floor Amendment {813223/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {733529/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |