House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {613521/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {613521/1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/04/2022 | Pre-filed |