Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB436 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *sb0436*
66
77 SENATE BILL 436
88 J1 3lr1723
99
1010 By: Senator Klausmeier
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2023
1212 Assigned to: Finance
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Medical Cannabis – Concurrent Grower and Processor Licenses 2
1919
2020 FOR the purpose of authorizing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to 3
2121 award a certain number of medical cannabis grower and processor licenses that may 4
2222 be held concurrently with certain other licenses issued by the Commission; requiring 5
2323 the Commission to publish certain license application forms and review certain 6
2424 license applications on or before certain dates; authorizing a licensed processor to 7
2525 apply for licensure as a medical cannabis grower, subject to certain requirements; 8
2626 authorizing a licensed grower to apply for licensure as a medical cannabis processor, 9
2727 subject to certain requirements; and generally relating to grower and processor 10
2828 licenses issued by the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission. 11
2929
3030 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12
3131 Article – Health – General 13
3232 Section 13–3301(a), (e), (j), and (n) 14
3333 Annotated Code of Maryland 15
3434 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 16
3535
3636 BY adding to 17
3737 Article – Health – General 18
3838 Section 13–3306.1 and 13–3309.1 19
3939 Annotated Code of Maryland 20
4040 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 21
4141
4242 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 22
4343 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 23
4444
4545 Article – Health – General 24
4646
4747 13–3301. 25
4848 2 SENATE BILL 436
4949
5050
5151 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 1
5252
5353 (e) “Commission” means the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission 2
5454 established under this subtitle. 3
5555
5656 (j) “Grower” means an entity licensed under this subtitle that: 4
5757
5858 (1) Cultivates or packages medical cannabis; and 5
5959
6060 (2) Is authorized by the Commission to provide cannabis to a processor, 6
6161 dispensary, or independent testing laboratory. 7
6262
6363 (n) “Processor” means an entity that: 8
6464
6565 (1) Transforms medical cannabis into another product or extract; and 9
6666
6767 (2) Packages and labels medical cannabis. 10
6868
6969 13–3306.1. 11
7070
7171 (A) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION A ND 12
7272 SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION, THE COMMISSION MAY AWARD THREE GROWER 13
7373 LICENSES TO ENTITIES WITH EXISTING PROCESSOR LICENSES . 14
7474
7575 (2) THE GROWER LICENSES A WARDED UNDER PARAGRA PH (1) OF 15
7676 THIS SUBSECTION ARE IN ADDITION TO THE N UMBER OF GROWER LICE NSES 16
7777 AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–3306 OF THIS SUBTITLE . 17
7878
7979 (B) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, A LICENSED PROCESSOR MAY APPLY FOR 18
8080 CONCURRENT LICENSURE AS A GROWER UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION 19
8181 IF, AT THE TIME OF APPLI CATION, THE PROCESSOR : 20
8282
8383 (1) AFTER JANUARY 1, 2019: 21
8484
8585 (I) RECEIVED STAGE ONE PREAPPROVAL AS A PROCESSOR ; OR 22
8686
8787 (II) OBTAINED OWNERSHIP OF A PROCESSOR LICENSE AS A 23
8888 PURCHASER OR TRANSFE REE OF THE LICENSE U NDER § 13–3311.1 OF THIS 24
8989 SUBTITLE; 25
9090
9191 (2) HAS AN OPERATIONAL FACILITY THAT IS USED FOR THE 26
9292 PROCESSING OF MEDICAL CANNABIS; 27
9393 SENATE BILL 436 3
9494
9595
9696 (3) DEMONSTRATES TO THE COMMISSION THROUGH A CERTIFIED 1
9797 FINANCIAL STATEMENT THAT THE PROCESSOR H AS ADEQUATE CAPITAL TO 2
9898 OPERATE AS A CONCURR ENTLY LICENSED PROCE SSOR AND GROWER ; 3
9999
100100 (4) PREVIOUSLY APPLIED FO R A GROWER LICENSE B EFORE JANUARY 4
101101 1, 2022; AND 5
102102
103103 (5) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION, MEETS ANY 6
104104 OTHER MINIMUM STANDA RDS THAT ARE DETERMINED BY THE COMMISSION TO BE 7
105105 NECESSARY FOR AN APPLICATION AS A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D GROWER AND 8
106106 PROCESSOR. 9
107107
108108 (C) THE MINIMUM STANDARDS ESTABLISHED BY THE COMMISSION FOR AN 10
109109 APPLICATION UNDER SUBSECTION (B)(5) OF THIS SECTION MAY NOT EXCEED THE 11
110110 GROWER APPLICATION S TANDARDS ESTABLISHED BY THE COMMISSION UNDER § 12
111111 13–3306 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 13
112112
113113 (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2023, THE COMMISSION SHALL 14
114114 PUBLISH THE APPLICAT ION FORM TO BE A CON CURRENTLY LICENSED PRO CESSOR 15
115115 AND GROWER ON THE COMMISSION’S WEBSITE. 16
116116
117117 (2) THE COMMISSION SHALL APPROVE OR DENY APPLICATIONS 17
118118 UNDER THIS SECTION W ITHIN 90 DAYS OF THE APPLICAT ION. 18
119119
120120 (E) (1) A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D PROCESSOR AND GROW ER UNDER 19
121121 THIS SECTION MAY NOT OPERATE A FACILITY F OR GROWING CANNABIS THAT 20
122122 EXCEEDS 20,000 SQUARE FEET OF CANOPY SPACE , AS CALCULATED BY THE 21
123123 COMMISSION IN ACCORDA NCE WITH PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION . 22
124124
125125 (2) THE CANOPY AREA SHALL BE MEASURED USING THE O UTSIDE 23
126126 BOUNDARIES OF ANY AREA THAT INCLUDES F LOWERING CANNABIS PL ANTS AND ALL 24
127127 OF THE SPACE WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES . 25
128128
129129 (F) A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D PROCESSOR AND GROW ER MAY NOT SELL 26
130130 OR TRANSFER OWNERSHI P OF A GROWER LICENS E AWARDED UNDER THIS SECTION 27
131131 FOR AT LEAST 3 YEARS FOLLOWING THE AWARD OF THE GROWER LICENS E. 28
132132
133133 (G) A GROWER LICENSED UNDE R THIS SECTION IS SU BJECT TO THE 29
134134 LICENSED GROWER REQU IREMENTS UNDER § 13–3306 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 30
135135
136136 13–3309.1. 31
137137 4 SENATE BILL 436
138138
139139
140140 (A) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION A ND 1
141141 SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION, THE COMMISSION MAY AWARD TWO PROCESSOR 2
142142 LICENSES TO ENTITIES WITH EXISTING GROWER LICENSES. 3
143143
144144 (2) THE PROCESSOR LICENSE S AWARDED UNDER PARA GRAPH (1) OF 4
145145 THIS SUBSECTION ARE IN ADDITION TO THE NUMBE R OF PROCESSOR LICEN SES 5
146146 AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–3309 OF THIS SUBTITLE . 6
147147
148148 (B) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, A LICENSED GROWER MA Y APPLY FOR 7
149149 CONCURRENT LICENSURE AS A PROCESSOR UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 8
150150 SECTION IF, AT THE TIME OF APPLI CATION, THE GROWER : 9
151151
152152 (1) RECEIVED STAGE ONE PREAPPROVAL AS A GROWER AFTER 10
153153 JANUARY 1, 2019; 11
154154
155155 (2) HAS AN OPERATIONAL FA CILITY THAT IS USED FOR THE GROWING 12
156156 OF MEDICAL CANNABIS ; 13
157157
158158 (3) DEMONSTRATES TO THE COMMISSION THROUGH A CERTIFIED 14
159159 FINANCIAL STATEMENT THAT THE GROWER HAS ADEQU ATE CAPITAL TO OPERA TE 15
160160 AS A CONCURRENTLY LI CENSED GROWER AND PR OCESSOR; 16
161161
162162 (4) PREVIOUSLY APPLIED FO R A PROCESSOR LICENS E BEFORE 17
163163 JANUARY 1, 2022; AND 18
164164
165165 (5) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION , MEETS ANY 19
166166 OTHER MINIMUM STANDA RDS THAT ARE DETERMINED BY THE COMMISSION TO BE 20
167167 NECESSARY FOR AN APP LICATION AS A CONCUR RENTLY LICENSED PROC ESSOR AND 21
168168 GROWER. 22
169169
170170 (C) THE MINIMUM STANDARDS ESTABLISHED BY THE COMMISSION FOR AN 23
171171 APPLICATION UNDER SU BSECTION (B)(5) OF THIS SECTION MAY NOT EXCEED THE 24
172172 PROCESSOR APPLICATIO N STANDARDS ESTABLIS HED BY THE COMMISSION UNDER 25
173173 § 13–3309 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 26
174174
175175 (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2023, THE COMMISSION SHALL 27
176176 PUBLISH THE APPLICAT ION FORM TO BE A CON CURRENTLY LICENSED G ROWER AND 28
177177 PROCESSOR ON THE COMMISSION’S WEBSITE. 29
178178
179179 (2) THE COMMISSION SHALL APPROVE OR DENY APPLICATIONS 30
180180 UNDER THIS SECTION W ITHIN 90 DAYS OF THE APPLICAT ION. 31
181181 SENATE BILL 436 5
182182
183183
184184 (E) A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D GROWER AND PROCESS OR MAY NOT SELL 1
185185 OR TRANSFER OWNERSHI P OF A PROCESSOR LIC ENSE AWARDED UNDER THIS 2
186186 SECTION FOR AT LEAST 3 YEARS FOLLOWING THE AWARD OF THE PROCESSOR 3
187187 LICENSE. 4
188188
189189 (F) A PROCESSOR LICENSED U NDER THIS SECTION IS SUBJECT TO THE 5
190190 LICENSED PROCESSOR R EQUIREMENTS UNDER § 13–3309 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 6
191191
192192 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 7
193193 October 1, 2023. 8