Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB436 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/02/2023

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0436*  
  
SENATE BILL 436 
J1   	3lr1723 
      
By: Senator Klausmeier 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2023 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Medical Cannabis – Concurrent Grower and Processor Licenses 2 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to 3 
award a certain number of medical cannabis grower and processor licenses that may 4 
be held concurrently with certain other licenses issued by the Commission; requiring 5 
the Commission to publish certain license application forms and review certain 6 
license applications on or before certain dates; authorizing a licensed processor to 7 
apply for licensure as a medical cannabis grower, subject to certain requirements; 8 
authorizing a licensed grower to apply for licensure as a medical cannabis processor, 9 
subject to certain requirements; and generally relating to grower and processor 10 
licenses issued by the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission. 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 
 Article – Health – General 13 
Section 13–3301(a), (e), (j), and (n) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – Health – General 18 
Section 13–3306.1 and 13–3309.1 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 21 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 22 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 23 
 
Article – Health – General 24 
 
13–3301. 25 
  2 	SENATE BILL 436  
 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 1 
 
 (e) “Commission” means the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission 2 
established under this subtitle. 3 
 
 (j) “Grower” means an entity licensed under this subtitle that: 4 
 
 (1) Cultivates or packages medical cannabis; and 5 
 
 (2) Is authorized by the Commission to provide cannabis to a processor, 6 
dispensary, or independent testing laboratory. 7 
 
 (n) “Processor” means an entity that: 8 
 
 (1) Transforms medical cannabis into another product or extract; and 9 
 
 (2) Packages and labels medical cannabis. 10 
 
13–3306.1. 11 
 
 (A) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION A ND 12 
SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION, THE COMMISSION MAY AWARD THREE GROWER 13 
LICENSES TO ENTITIES WITH EXISTING PROCESSOR LICENSES . 14 
 
 (2) THE GROWER LICENSES A WARDED UNDER PARAGRA PH (1) OF 15 
THIS SUBSECTION ARE IN ADDITION TO THE N UMBER OF GROWER LICE NSES 16 
AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–3306 OF THIS SUBTITLE . 17 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, A LICENSED PROCESSOR MAY APPLY FOR 18 
CONCURRENT LICENSURE AS A GROWER UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION 19 
IF, AT THE TIME OF APPLI CATION, THE PROCESSOR : 20 
 
 (1) AFTER JANUARY 1, 2019: 21 
 
 (I) RECEIVED STAGE ONE PREAPPROVAL AS A PROCESSOR ; OR 22 
 
 (II) OBTAINED OWNERSHIP OF A PROCESSOR LICENSE AS A 23 
PURCHASER OR TRANSFE REE OF THE LICENSE U NDER § 13–3311.1 OF THIS 24 
SUBTITLE; 25 
 
 (2) HAS AN OPERATIONAL FACILITY THAT IS USED FOR THE 26 
PROCESSING OF MEDICAL CANNABIS; 27 
   	SENATE BILL 436 	3 
 
 
 (3) DEMONSTRATES TO THE COMMISSION THROUGH A CERTIFIED 1 
FINANCIAL STATEMENT THAT THE PROCESSOR H AS ADEQUATE CAPITAL TO 2 
OPERATE AS A CONCURR ENTLY LICENSED PROCE SSOR AND GROWER ; 3 
 
 (4) PREVIOUSLY APPLIED FO R A GROWER LICENSE B EFORE JANUARY 4 
1, 2022; AND 5 
 
 (5) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION, MEETS ANY 6 
OTHER MINIMUM STANDA RDS THAT ARE DETERMINED BY THE COMMISSION TO BE 7 
NECESSARY FOR AN APPLICATION AS A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D GROWER AND 8 
PROCESSOR. 9 
 
 (C) THE MINIMUM STANDARDS ESTABLISHED BY THE COMMISSION FOR AN 10 
APPLICATION UNDER SUBSECTION (B)(5) OF THIS SECTION MAY NOT EXCEED THE 11 
GROWER APPLICATION S TANDARDS ESTABLISHED BY THE COMMISSION UNDER § 12 
13–3306 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 13 
 
 (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2023, THE COMMISSION SHALL 14 
PUBLISH THE APPLICAT ION FORM TO BE A CON CURRENTLY LICENSED PRO CESSOR 15 
AND GROWER ON THE COMMISSION’S WEBSITE. 16 
 
 (2) THE COMMISSION SHALL APPROVE OR DENY APPLICATIONS 17 
UNDER THIS SECTION W ITHIN 90 DAYS OF THE APPLICAT ION. 18 
 
 (E) (1) A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D PROCESSOR AND GROW ER UNDER 19 
THIS SECTION MAY NOT OPERATE A FACILITY F OR GROWING CANNABIS THAT 20 
EXCEEDS 20,000 SQUARE FEET OF CANOPY SPACE , AS CALCULATED BY THE 21 
COMMISSION IN ACCORDA NCE WITH PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION .  22 
 
 (2) THE CANOPY AREA SHALL BE MEASURED USING THE O UTSIDE 23 
BOUNDARIES OF ANY AREA THAT INCLUDES F LOWERING CANNABIS PL ANTS AND ALL 24 
OF THE SPACE WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES . 25 
 
 (F) A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D PROCESSOR AND GROW ER MAY NOT SELL 26 
OR TRANSFER OWNERSHI P OF A GROWER LICENS E AWARDED UNDER THIS SECTION 27 
FOR AT LEAST 3 YEARS FOLLOWING THE AWARD OF THE GROWER LICENS E. 28 
 
 (G) A GROWER LICENSED UNDE R THIS SECTION IS SU BJECT TO THE 29 
LICENSED GROWER REQU IREMENTS UNDER § 13–3306 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 30 
 
13–3309.1. 31 
  4 	SENATE BILL 436  
 
 
 (A) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION A ND 1 
SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION, THE COMMISSION MAY AWARD TWO PROCESSOR 2 
LICENSES TO ENTITIES WITH EXISTING GROWER LICENSES. 3 
 
 (2) THE PROCESSOR LICENSE S AWARDED UNDER PARA GRAPH (1) OF 4 
THIS SUBSECTION ARE IN ADDITION TO THE NUMBE R OF PROCESSOR LICEN SES 5 
AUTHORIZED UNDER § 13–3309 OF THIS SUBTITLE . 6 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2024, A LICENSED GROWER MA Y APPLY FOR 7 
CONCURRENT LICENSURE AS A PROCESSOR UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 8 
SECTION IF, AT THE TIME OF APPLI CATION, THE GROWER : 9 
 
 (1) RECEIVED STAGE ONE PREAPPROVAL AS A GROWER AFTER 10 
JANUARY 1, 2019; 11 
 
 (2) HAS AN OPERATIONAL FA CILITY THAT IS USED FOR THE GROWING 12 
OF MEDICAL CANNABIS ; 13 
 
 (3) DEMONSTRATES TO THE COMMISSION THROUGH A CERTIFIED 14 
FINANCIAL STATEMENT THAT THE GROWER HAS ADEQU ATE CAPITAL TO OPERA TE 15 
AS A CONCURRENTLY LI CENSED GROWER AND PR OCESSOR; 16 
 
 (4) PREVIOUSLY APPLIED FO R A PROCESSOR LICENS E BEFORE 17 
JANUARY 1, 2022; AND 18 
 
 (5) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION , MEETS ANY 19 
OTHER MINIMUM STANDA RDS THAT ARE DETERMINED BY THE COMMISSION TO BE 20 
NECESSARY FOR AN APP LICATION AS A CONCUR RENTLY LICENSED PROC ESSOR AND 21 
GROWER. 22 
 
 (C) THE MINIMUM STANDARDS ESTABLISHED BY THE COMMISSION FOR AN 23 
APPLICATION UNDER SU BSECTION (B)(5) OF THIS SECTION MAY NOT EXCEED THE 24 
PROCESSOR APPLICATIO N STANDARDS ESTABLIS HED BY THE COMMISSION UNDER 25 
§ 13–3309 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 26 
 
 (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2023, THE COMMISSION SHALL 27 
PUBLISH THE APPLICAT ION FORM TO BE A CON CURRENTLY LICENSED G ROWER AND 28 
PROCESSOR ON THE COMMISSION’S WEBSITE. 29 
 
 (2) THE COMMISSION SHALL APPROVE OR DENY APPLICATIONS 30 
UNDER THIS SECTION W ITHIN 90 DAYS OF THE APPLICAT ION. 31 
   	SENATE BILL 436 	5 
 
 
 (E) A CONCURRENTLY LICENSE D GROWER AND PROCESS OR MAY NOT SELL 1 
OR TRANSFER OWNERSHI P OF A PROCESSOR LIC ENSE AWARDED UNDER THIS 2 
SECTION FOR AT LEAST 3 YEARS FOLLOWING THE AWARD OF THE PROCESSOR 3 
LICENSE. 4 
 
 (F) A PROCESSOR LICENSED U NDER THIS SECTION IS SUBJECT TO THE 5 
LICENSED PROCESSOR R EQUIREMENTS UNDER § 13–3309 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 6 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 7 
October 1, 2023. 8