Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (126-10) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {313727/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {893521/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |