Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (132-4) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {793828/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/26/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |