Senate | 05/12/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {303424/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |