Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 614 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 614 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 553) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0553* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Military Retirement Income | |
10 | - | (Keep Our Heroes Home Act) | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 553 | |
11 | + | Q3 3lr0122 | |
12 | + | CF HB 554 | |
13 | + | By: The President (By Request – Administration) and Senators Jackson, | |
14 | + | Jennings, Smith, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Brooks, Carozza, Corderman, | |
15 | + | Elfreth, Ellis, Folden, Gallion, Gile, Griffith, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, | |
16 | + | James, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, McKay, Ready, Salling, Waldstreicher, | |
17 | + | Watson, West, and Zucker | |
18 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023 | |
19 | + | Assigned to: Budget and Taxation | |
20 | + | Committee Report: Favorable with amendments | |
21 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
22 | + | Read second time: March 10, 2023 | |
11 | 23 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of increasing the amount of a certain subtraction modification under the | |
13 | - | Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income received by individuals, | |
14 | - | regardless of age, during the taxable year for certain military service; and generally | |
15 | - | relating to a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for military | |
16 | - | retirement income. | |
24 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
17 | 25 | ||
18 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, | |
19 | - | Article – Tax – General | |
20 | - | Section 10–207(a) | |
21 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
22 | - | (2022 Replacement Volume) | |
26 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
23 | 27 | ||
24 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
25 | - | Article – Tax – General | |
26 | - | Section 10–207(q) | |
27 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
28 | - | (2022 Replacement Volume) | |
28 | + | Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Military Retirement Income 2 | |
29 | + | (Keep Our Heroes Home Act) 3 | |
29 | 30 | ||
30 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
31 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
31 | + | FOR the purpose of increasing the amount of a certain subtraction modification under the 4 | |
32 | + | Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income received by individuals, 5 | |
33 | + | regardless of age, during the taxable year for certain military service; and generally 6 | |
34 | + | relating to a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for military 7 | |
35 | + | retirement income. 8 | |
32 | 36 | ||
33 | - | Article – Tax – General | |
37 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 | |
38 | + | Article – Tax – General 10 | |
39 | + | Section 10–207(a) 11 | |
40 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 12 | |
41 | + | (2022 Replacement Volume) 13 | |
34 | 42 | ||
35 | - | 10–207. | |
43 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 | |
44 | + | Article – Tax – General 15 | |
45 | + | Section 10–207(q) 16 | |
46 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 17 | |
47 | + | (2022 Replacement Volume) 18 | |
48 | + | 2 SENATE BILL 553 | |
36 | 49 | ||
37 | - | (a) To the extent included in federal adjusted gross income, the amounts under | |
38 | - | this section are subtracted from the federal adjusted gross income of a resident to determine | |
39 | - | Maryland adjusted gross income. | |
40 | 50 | ||
41 | - | | |
42 | - | ||
51 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 | |
52 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 | |
43 | 53 | ||
44 | - | (ii) “Military retirement income” means retirement income, | |
45 | - | including death benefits, received as a result of military service. | |
54 | + | Article – Tax – General 3 | |
46 | 55 | ||
47 | - | (iii) “Military service” means: | |
48 | - | Ch. 614 2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
56 | + | 10–207. 4 | |
49 | 57 | ||
50 | - | – 2 – | |
51 | - | 1. induction into the armed forces of the United States for | |
52 | - | training and service under the Selective Training and Service Act of 1940 or a subsequent | |
53 | - | act of a similar nature; | |
58 | + | (a) To the extent included in federal adjusted gross income, the amounts under 5 | |
59 | + | this section are subtracted from the federal adjusted gross income of a resident to determine 6 | |
60 | + | Maryland adjusted gross income. 7 | |
54 | 61 | ||
55 | - | | |
56 | - | ||
62 | + | (q) (1) (i) In this subsection the following words have the meanings 8 | |
63 | + | indicated. 9 | |
57 | 64 | ||
58 | - | | |
59 | - | ||
65 | + | (ii) “Military retirement income” means retirement income, 10 | |
66 | + | including death benefits, received as a result of military service. 11 | |
60 | 67 | ||
61 | - | | |
68 | + | (iii) “Military service” means: 12 | |
62 | 69 | ||
63 | - | | |
64 | - | ||
65 | - | ||
70 | + | 1. induction into the armed forces of the United States for 13 | |
71 | + | training and service under the Selective Training and Service Act of 1940 or a subsequent 14 | |
72 | + | act of a similar nature; 15 | |
66 | 73 | ||
67 | - | (2) The subtraction under subsection (a) of this section includes: | |
74 | + | 2. membership in a reserve component of the armed forces of 16 | |
75 | + | the United States; 17 | |
68 | 76 | ||
69 | - | [(i) if, on the last day of the taxable year, the individual is under the | |
70 | - | age of 55 years, the first $5,000 $12,500 of military retirement income received by an | |
71 | - | individual during the taxable year; and | |
77 | + | 3. membership in an active component of the armed forces of 18 | |
78 | + | the United States; 19 | |
72 | 79 | ||
73 | - | (ii) if, on the last day of the taxable year, the individual is at least 55 | |
74 | - | years old, the first $15,000 $20,000 of military retirement income received by an individual | |
75 | - | during the taxable year] | |
80 | + | 4. membership in the Maryland National Guard; or 20 | |
76 | 81 | ||
77 | - | | |
78 | - | ||
79 | - | ||
82 | + | 5. active duty with the commissioned corps of the Public 21 | |
83 | + | Health Service, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, or the Coast and 22 | |
84 | + | Geodetic Survey. 23 | |
80 | 85 | ||
81 | - | (II) FOR A TAXABLE YEAR B EGINNING AFTER DECEMBER 31, | |
82 | - | 2023, THE FIRST $40,000 OF MILITARY RETIREME NT INCOME RECEIVED B Y AN | |
83 | - | INDIVIDUAL DURING TH E TAXABLE YEAR . | |
86 | + | (2) The subtraction under subsection (a) of this section includes: 24 | |
84 | 87 | ||
85 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July | |
86 | - | 1, 2023, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022. | |
88 | + | [(i) if, on the last day of the taxable year, the individual is under the 25 | |
89 | + | age of 55 years, the first $5,000 $12,500 of military retirement income received by an 26 | |
90 | + | individual during the taxable year; and 27 | |
87 | 91 | ||
88 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 12, 2023. | |
92 | + | (ii) if, on the last day of the taxable year, the individual is at least 55 28 | |
93 | + | years old, the first $15,000 $20,000 of military retirement income received by an individual 29 | |
94 | + | during the taxable year] 30 | |
95 | + | SENATE BILL 553 3 | |
96 | + | ||
97 | + | ||
98 | + | (I) FOR A TAXABLE YEAR B EGINNING AFTER DECEMBER 31, 1 | |
99 | + | 2022, BUT BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2024, THE FIRST $25,000 OF MILITARY RETIREME NT 2 | |
100 | + | INCOME RECEIVED BY A N INDIVIDUAL DURING THE TAXABLE YEAR ; AND 3 | |
101 | + | ||
102 | + | (II) FOR A TAXABLE YEAR B EGINNING AFTER DECEMBER 31, 4 | |
103 | + | 2023, THE FIRST $40,000 OF MILITARY RETIREME NT INCOME RECEIVED B Y AN 5 | |
104 | + | INDIVIDUAL DURING TH E TAXABLE YEAR . 6 | |
105 | + | ||
106 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 7 | |
107 | + | 1, 2023, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022. 8 | |
108 | + | ||
109 | + | ||
110 | + | ||
111 | + | ||
112 | + | Approved: | |
113 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
114 | + | Governor. | |
115 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
116 | + | President of the Senate. | |
117 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
118 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. |