House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {893926/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |