Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Floor Amendment {703923/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {303225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |