WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 503 – 1 – Chapter 503 (Senate Bill 693) AN ACT concerning Transportation – Assaults on Public Transit Operators – Report FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit a certain annual report on assaults on public transit operators to certain persons; and generally relating to assaults on public transit operators. BY adding to Article – Transportation Section 7–714 Annotated Code of Maryland (2020 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: Article – Transportation 7–714. (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS INDICATED. (2) “LOCAL EXECUTIVE AUTHO RITY” MEANS: (I) 1. THE CHIEF EXECUTIVE O FFICER OF A COUNTY ; OR 2. IF A COUNTY DOES NOT HAVE A CHIEF EXECUTI VE OFFICER, THE COUNTY GOVERNING BODY; AND (II) IF A MUNICIPALITY OPE RATES A TRANSIT SYST EM: 1. THE CHIEF EXECUTIVE OF FICER OF THE MUNICIPALITY; OR 2. IF THE MUNICIPALITY D OES NOT HAVE A CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER , THE GOVERNING BODY O F THE MUNICIPALITY . (3) (I) “PUBLIC TRANSIT OPERAT OR” MEANS AN INDIVIDUAL WHO IS: Ch. 503 2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 2 – 1. EMPLOYED BY THE ADMINISTRATION , THE WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY, OR A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION; AND 2. ENGAGED IN PROVIDING PUBLIC TRANSPORTATIO N SERVICES, INCLUDING: A. BUS SERVICE; B. TRAIN SERVICE; C. LIGHT RAIL SERVICE; AND D. SUBWAY SERVICE . (II) “PUBLIC TRANSIT OPERAT OR” INCLUDES A TRANSIT STATION MANAGER . (B) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL SUBMIT AN ANNUAL REP ORT ON ASSAULTS ON PUBLIC T RANSIT OPERATORS AS REQUIRED BY THIS SEC TION. (C) THE REPORT SHAL L INCLUDE THE FOLLOW ING INFORMATION FOR THE IMMEDIATELY PRECEDIN G 12 MONTHS CALENDAR YEAR 12 MONTHS: (1) FOR EACH ASSAULT ON A PUBLIC TRANSIT OPERA TOR: (I) THE NATURE OF THE ASS AULT; (II) THE MODE OF TRANSIT W HERE THE ASSAULT OCC URRED; (III) THE LOCATION OF THE A SSAULT; (IV) WHETHER POLICE WERE I NVOLVED IN RESPONDIN G TO THE ASSAULT; AND (V) THE OUTCOME OF ANY IN VESTIGATION INTO THE ASSAULT, INCLUDING ANY DISCIP LINARY ACTION TAKEN , IF THE INFORMATION I S AVAILABLE; (2) A COMPARISON OF THE AG GREGATE DATA COMPILE D UNDER ITEM (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION W ITH AT LEAST TWO OTH ER STATES WITH SIMIL AR TRANSIT SYSTEMS OR P OPULATIONS; AND WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 503 – 3 – (3) A REVIEW OF CURRENT TR ANSIT INDUSTRY BEST PRACTICES TO PREVENT AND MITIGATE ASSAULTS ON PU BLIC TRANSIT OPERATO RS. (D) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1 EACH YEAR ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 31, 2024 DECEMBER 1, 2023, AND EACH JANUARY 31 DECEMBER 1 THEREAFTER , THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL SUBMIT THE REPORT UN DER THIS SECTION TO : (1) EACH LOCAL EXECUTIVE AUTHORITY; (2) THE STATE’S ATTORNEY FOR EACH COU NTY; AND (3) THE FOLLOWING COMMITT EES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE: (I) THE SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS COMMITTEE; (II) THE SENATE FINANCE COMMITTEE; (III) THE HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE; AND (IV) THE HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE. SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the report due on December 1, 2023, January 31, 2024 December 1, 2023, under § 7–714 of the Transportation Article as enacted by Section 1 of this Act shall include, in addition to the information required by § 7–714 of the Transportation Article as enacted by Section 1 of this Act, the following information: (1) the data described in § 7–714(c)(1) of the Transportation Article as enacted by Section 1 of this Act for each of the immediately preceding 5 years; (2) an evaluation of assault prevention and mitigation technology and policies for each transit system operated by a political subdivision; (3) recommendations to improve the existing assault prevention and mitigation technology and policies for each transit system operated by a political subdivision; and (4) an evaluation of the feasibility of establishing a statewide local transit safety officer to provide guidance to transit systems operated by political subdivisions on best practices to prevent and mitigate assaults on public transit operators. SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1, 2023. Ch. 503 2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 4 – Approved by the Governor, May 8, 2023.