House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-2) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Floor Amendment {583128/1 (Senator Beidle) Rejected (15-28) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Floor Amendment {143625/1 (Senator Beidle) Rejected | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Beidle) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |