Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB748 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/17/2023

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0748*  
  
SENATE BILL 748 
R4   	3lr1929 
      
By: Senator Folden 
Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 8, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Vehicle Laws – Military Vehicles – Registration and Operation  2 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to register certain 3 
military vehicles; providing for the registration classification of military vehicles; 4 
establishing certain standards and procedures for the registration of military 5 
vehicles; requiring an owner of a military vehicle to submit with the registration 6 
application a certain certification relating to the purposes for which the vehicle will 7 
be operated; requiring the Administration, in consultation with certain persons, to 8 
develop a safety inspection and a safety inspection process for military vehicles; and 9 
generally relating to the registration and operation of military vehicles. 10 
 
BY adding to 11 
 Article – Transportation 12 
Section 13–936.3 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 15 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 
 
Article – Transportation 18 
 
13–936.3. 19 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION , “MILITARY VEHICLE ” MEANS A WHEELED , 20  2 	SENATE BILL 748  
 
 
MULTIPURPOSE VEHICLE , INCLUDING A TRAILER , THAT: 1 
 
 (1) WAS MANUFACTURED FOR MILITARY USE BY OR U NDER THE 2 
DIRECTION OF THE UNITED STATES ARMED FORCES O R THE ARMED FORCES O F 3 
ANOTHER COUNTRY ; 4 
 
 (2) SUBSEQUENTLY WAS AUTH ORIZED FOR SALE TO C IVILIANS; 5 
 
 (3) MEETS FEDERAL MOTOR V EHICLE SAFETY STANDA RDS; AND 6 
 
 (4) HAS A VEHICLE IDENTIF ICATION NUMBER OR A UNIQUE SERIAL 7 
NUMBER ASSIGNED BY T HE MANUFACTURER . 8 
 
 (B) IF REGISTERED WITH TH E ADMINISTRATION UNDER THIS SECTION, 9 
EVERY MILITARY VEHIC LE IS A CLASS MV–C (MILITARY VEHICLE –COLLECTORS ) 10 
VEHICLE. 11 
 
 (C) FOR EACH MILITARY VEH ICLE, THERE IS A ONE –TIME REGISTRATION 12 
FEE OF $51. 13 
 
 (D) IN APPLYING FOR REGIS TRATION OF A MILITAR Y VEHICLE UNDER THIS 14 
SECTION, THE OWNER OF THE VEH ICLE SHALL SUBMIT WI TH THE APPLICATION A 15 
CERTIFICATION THAT T HE VEHICLE FOR WHICH THE APPLICATION IS M ADE: 16 
 
 (1) WILL BE OPERATED ONLY : 17 
 
 (I) IN OFF–HIGHWAY EVENTS , EXHIBITIONS, ON–HIGHWAY 18 
CLUB ACTIVITIES, PARADES, TOURS, AND OTHER SIMILAR EV ENTS; 19 
 
 (II) FOR TRANSPORTATION TO AND FROM THE EVENTS 20 
DESCRIBED IN ITEM (I) OF THIS ITEM; 21 
 
 (III) ON OCCASIONAL PLEASUR E TRIPS; OR 22 
 
 (IV) TO FACILITATE T HE SALE OR MAINTENAN CE OF THE 23 
VEHICLE; AND 24 
 
 (2) WILL NOT BE OPERATED : 25 
 
 (I) FOR GENERAL DAILY TRA NSPORTATION ; 26 
 
 (II) PRIMARILY FOR THE TRA NSPORTATION OF PASSE NGERS OR 27 
PROPERTY ON HIGHWAYS ; 28   	SENATE BILL 748 	3 
 
 
 
 (III) FOR EMPLOYMENT ; 1 
 
 (IV) FOR TRANSPORTATION TO AND FROM EMPLOYMENT OR 2 
SCHOOL; OR 3 
 
 (V) FOR COMMERCIAL PURPOS ES. 4 
 
 (E) (1) WHEN REGISTERING A MI LITARY VEHICLE UNDER THIS SECTION, 5 
THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL : 6 
 
 (I) ASSIGN A DISTINGUISHI NG NUMBER TO THE VEH ICLE; AND 7 
 
 (II) ISSUE TO ITS OWNER A STAMPED OR S PECIAL PLATE 8 
BEARING THE DISTINGU ISHING NUMBER . 9 
 
 (2) THE OWNER SHALL ATTAC H THE STAMPED OR SPE CIAL PLATE TO 10 
THE MILITARY VEHICLE AS THE ADMINISTRATION REQUIR ES. 11 
 
 (F) (1) AN APPLICANT FOR THE REGISTRATION OF A MI LITARY VEHICLE 12 
SHALL PROVIDE PROOF ACCEPTABLE TO THE ADMINISTRATION THAT T HE VEHICLE 13 
HAS PASSED A SAFETY INSPECTION. 14 
 
 (2) THE ADMINISTRATION , IN CONSULTATION WITH THE 15 
DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE AND MILITARY V EHICLE OWNERS IN THE STATE, 16 
SHALL DEVELOP A SAFE TY INSPECTION AND A SAFETY INSPECTION PR OCESS FOR 17 
MILITARY VEHICLES . 18 
 
 (G) (1) A MILITARY VEHICLE REG ISTERED UNDER A DIFF ERENT 19 
REGISTRATION CLASS B EFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, MAY CONTINUE TO BE 20 
REGISTERED UNDER THA T REGISTRATION CLASS . 21 
 
 (2) IF A MILITARY VEHICLE REGISTERED UNDER A D IFFERENT 22 
REGISTRATION CLASS I S TRANSFERRED TO A N EW OWNER, THE MILITARY VEHICLE 23 
SHALL BE REGISTERED UNDER THIS SECTION . 24 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 25 
October 1, 2023. 26