House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |