Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (99-39) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (31-12) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {383926/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Carozza) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {383926/1 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |