Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {603923/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |