Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {373024/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |