Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {913423/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |