House | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {983624/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First Reading Senate Rules |