EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *sb0966* SENATE BILL 966 J1, L2 3lr3119 By: Senator Muse Introduced and read first time: February 28, 2023 Assigned to: Rules Re–referred to: Finance, March 3, 2023 Committee Report: Favorable with amendments Senate action: Adopted Read second time: March 20, 2023 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Prince George’s County – Workgroup on Health and Wellness 2 FOR the purpose of establishing a Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s 3 County to review and evaluate certain information and make certain 4 recommendations related to health and wellness in Prince George’s County; and 5 generally relating to the Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s 6 County. 7 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 That: 9 (a) There is a Workgroup on Health and Wellness in Prince George’s County. 10 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 11 (1) the Chair of the Prince George’s County Senate Delegation, or the 12 Chair’s designee; 13 (2) the Chair of the Prince George’s County House Delegation, or the 14 Chair’s designee; 15 (3) the Chair of the Prince George’s County Council, or the Chair’s 16 designee; 17 2 SENATE BILL 966 (4) the following members, appointed by the Chair of the Prince George’s 1 County Senate Delegation: 2 (i) two representatives of small and local health and wellness 3 businesses; and 4 (ii) one integrative health and wellness practitioner; and 5 (5) the following members, appointed by the Prince George’s County 6 Executive: 7 (i) one certified dietitian providing services in Prince George’s 8 County; 9 (ii) two health and wellness practitioners in Prince George’s County; 10 and 11 (iii) one representative of the Prince George’s County Food Equity 12 Council; and 13 (iv) one representative from Nonprofit Prince George’s County. 14 (c) The Prince George’s County Health Officer shall designate the chair of the 15 Workgroup. 16 (d) The University System of Maryland Prince George’s County Health 17 Department shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 18 (e) A member of the Workgroup or a subgroup established under subsection (g) of 19 this section: 20 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup or 21 subgroup; but 22 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 23 Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 24 (f) The Workgroup shall: 25 (1) review the availability of health and wellness practices in Prince 26 George’s County; 27 (2) review available options for integrative health and wellness programs 28 in Prince George’s County; 29 (3) review programs that promote healthy eating within the Prince 30 George’s County government agencies; 31 SENATE BILL 966 3 (4) make recommendations regarding the best practices in health and 1 wellness community programming, including strategies and programs that: 2 (i) promote healthy eating; 3 (ii) improve equitable access to healthy, affordable, and accessible 4 food retailers; 5 (iii) improve equitable access to environments that are built and 6 promote physical activity, including: 7 1. gymnasiums; 8 2. recreation centers; 9 3. athletic fields and facilities; 10 4. playgrounds; 11 5. sidewalks; and 12 6. bicycle and walking paths; 13 (iv) reduce the density in specified areas of calorie–dense and fast 14 food restaurants and retailers; and 15 (v) promote healthy eating, physical activity, and nonsedentary 16 habits for obesity prevention; 17 (5) make recommendations for incentives that may be provided to 18 employers, businesses, and Prince George’s County agencies to promote health and 19 wellness strategies and programs identified under item (4) of this subsection; 20 (6) review and report on the benefits of incorporating integrative health 21 into various aspects of Prince George’s County; and 22 (7) evaluate the benefit and feasibility of creating integrative health and 23 wellness hubs in Prince George’s County. 24 (g) (1) The Workgroup may establish a subgroup to assist in carrying out its 25 duties, including conducting research and producing reports. 26 (2) A subgroup established under paragraph (1) of this subsection may 27 include an individual who is not a member of the Workgroup, such as a representative of a 28 relevant expert. 29 4 SENATE BILL 966 (h) On or before December 1, 2024, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 1 recommendations to the Prince George’s County Executive, the Chair of the Prince George’s 2 County Council, the Governor, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 3 Article, the General Assembly. 4 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENAC TED, That this Act shall take effect July 5 1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2025, 6 this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 7 of no further force and effect. 8 Approved: ________________________________________________________________________________ Governor. ________________________________________________________________________________ President of the Senate. ________________________________________________________________________________ Speaker of the House of Delegates.