Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1029 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *hb1029*
66
77 HOUSE BILL 1029
88 C7, J1 4lr2795
99 CF SB 878
1010 By: Delegate Allen
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 5, 2024
1212 Assigned to: Ways and Means
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue 2
1919
2020 FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct certain 3
2121 prevalence studies concerning problem and pathological mobile gambling; altering 4
2222 the distribution of certain State lottery, fantasy competition, and sports wagering 5
2323 proceeds; and generally relating to problem gambling and the Problem Gambling 6
2424 Fund. 7
2525
2626 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 8
2727 Article – Health – General 9
2828 Section 19–804 10
2929 Annotated Code of Maryland 11
3030 (2023 Replacement Volume) 12
3131
3232 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13
3333 Article – State Government 14
3434 Section 9–120(b)(1)(xii) and (xiii), 9–1D–04, and 9–1E–12(b) 15
3535 Annotated Code of Maryland 16
3636 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 17
3737
3838 BY adding to 18
3939 Article – State Government 19
4040 Section 9–120(b)(1)(xiii) 20
4141 Annotated Code of Maryland 21
4242 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 22
4343
4444 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 23
4545 Article – State Government 24
4646 Section 9–1E–12(a) 25
4747 Annotated Code of Maryland 26
4848 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 27 2 HOUSE BILL 1029
4949
5050
5151
5252 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1
5353 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2
5454
5555 Article – Health – General 3
5656
5757 19–804. 4
5858
5959 (a) (1) The Secretary shall make grants from or agreements for the use of State 5
6060 funds, including the funds provided under § 9–1A–33 of the State Government Article, and 6
6161 federal funds to help public agencies or nonprofit organizations operate the network of 7
6262 clinically appropriate services for problem gamblers who reside in the State to provide the 8
6363 following: 9
6464
6565 (i) Inpatient and residential services; 10
6666
6767 (ii) Outpatient services; 11
6868
6969 (iii) Intensive outpatient services; 12
7070
7171 (iv) Continuing care services; 13
7272
7373 (v) Educational services; 14
7474
7575 (vi) Services for victims of domestic violence; and 15
7676
7777 (vii) Other preventive or rehabilitative services or treatment. 16
7878
7979 (2) Research and training that are designed to improve or extend these 17
8080 services are proper items of expense. 18
8181
8282 (b) The Secretary shall conduct [a]: 19
8383
8484 (1) A prevalence study and replication prevalence studies to measure the 20
8585 rate of problem and pathological IN–PERSON gambling in the State; AND 21
8686
8787 (2) A PREVALENCE STUDY AND REPLICATION PREVALEN CE STUDIES 22
8888 TO MEASURE THE RATE OF PROBLEM AND PATHOLOGICAL MOBILE GAMBLING IN 23
8989 THE STATE. 24
9090
9191 (c) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, the Secretary shall contract 25
9292 with an independent researcher to conduct the prevalence studies. 26
9393
9494 (2) The Secretary shall utilize the most current psychiatric or diagnostic 27
9595 criteria for problem and pathological gambling as the basis for the prevalence studies. 28
9696 HOUSE BILL 1029 3
9797
9898
9999 (d) (1) The initial prevalence study ON PROBLEM AND PATHO LOGICAL 1
100100 IN–PERSON GAMBLING IN T HE STATE shall be completed on or before July 1, 2009. 2
101101
102102 (2) THE INITIAL PREVALENC E STUDY ON PROBLEM A ND 3
103103 PATHOLOGICAL MOBILE GAMBLING IN THE STATE SHALL BE COMPLE TED ON OR 4
104104 BEFORE JULY 1, 2029. 5
105105
106106 (e) Replication prevalence studies shall be conducted no less than every 5 years 6
107107 with measures taken to permit comparisons between the initial prevalence study and 7
108108 subsequent replication prevalence studies. 8
109109
110110 (f) Services under this subtitle shall be provided by public agencies or, under 9
111111 contract, by nonprofit organizations. 10
112112
113113 Article – State Government 11
114114
115115 9–120. 12
116116
117117 (b) (1) By the end of the month following collection, the Comptroller shall 13
118118 deposit, cause to be deposited, or pay: 14
119119
120120 (xii) after June 30, 2023, into the Prince George’s County Blue Line 15
121121 Corridor Facility Fund established under § 10–657.6 of the Economic Development Article 16
122122 from the money that remains in the State Lottery Fund from the proceeds of all lotteries 17
123123 after the distributions under subsection (a) of this section and items (i) through (xi) of this 18
124124 paragraph, an amount not to exceed $27,000,000 to be paid in two installments not later 19
125125 than November 1 and June 1 of each fiscal year; [and] 20
126126
127127 (XIII) AFTER JUNE 30, 2024, INTO THE PROBLEM GAMBLING 21
128128 FUND ESTABLISHED UNDE R § 9–1A–33 OF THIS TITLE, 1% OF THE MONEY THAT 22
129129 REMAINS IN THE STATE LOTTERY FUND FROM THE PROCEED S OF ALL LOTTERIES 23
130130 EACH FISCAL YEAR , EXCEPT FROM THE INST ANT TICKET LOTTERY M ACHINES 24
131131 UNDER § 9–112 OF THIS SUBTITLE, AFTER THE DISTRIBUTI ONS UNDER SUBSECTION 25
132132 (A) OF THIS SECTION AND ITEMS (I) THROUGH (XII) OF THIS PARAGRAPH ; AND 26
133133
134134 [(xiii)] (XIV) into the General Fund of the State the money that remains 27
135135 in the State Lottery Fund from the proceeds of all lotteries after the distributions under 28
136136 subsection (a) of this section and items (i) through [(xii)] (XIII) of this paragraph. 29
137137
138138 9–1D–04. 30
139139
140140 (a) A fantasy competition operator shall retain [85%] 84% of the proceeds and 31
141141 pay the remainder to the Commission. 32
142142 4 HOUSE BILL 1029
143143
144144
145145 (b) [The Commission shall distribute the proceeds paid ] FROM THE 1
146146 REMAINDER OF THE PRO CEEDS PAID TO THE COMMISSION under subsection (a) of this 2
147147 section, THE COMMISSION SHALL PAY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNT S: 3
148148
149149 (1) 93.75% to the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future Fund established under 4
150150 § 5–206 of the Education Article; AND 5
151151
152152 (2) 6.25% TO THE PROBLEM GAMBLING FUND ESTABLISHED UNDE R 6
153153 § 9–1A–33 OF THIS TITLE. 7
154154
155155 9–1E–12. 8
156156
157157 (a) (1) The Commission shall account to the Comptroller for all of the revenue 9
158158 under this subtitle. 10
159159
160160 (2) The proceeds from sports wagering, less the amount retained by the 11
161161 licensee under subsection (b)(1) of this section, shall be under the control of the Comptroller 12
162162 and distributed as provided under subsection (b) of this section. 13
163163
164164 (b) (1) (i) Except as provided in subparagraphs (ii), (iii), and (iv) of this 14
165165 paragraph, all proceeds from sports wagering shall be electronically transferred monthly 15
166166 into the State Lottery Fund established under Subtitle 1 of this title. 16
167167
168168 (ii) A Class A–1 and A–2 sports wagering facility licensee shall 17
169169 retain [85%] 84% of the proceeds from sports wagering conducted at the locations described 18
170170 in § 9–1E–09(a) of this subtitle. 19
171171
172172 (iii) A Class B–1 and B–2 sports wagering facility licensee shall 20
173173 retain [85%] 84% of the proceeds from sports wagering conducted at the location described 21
174174 in the licensee’s application. 22
175175
176176 (iv) A mobile sports wagering licensee shall retain [85%] 84% of the 23
177177 proceeds from online sports wagering received by the licensee. 24
178178
179179 (2) All proceeds from sports wagering in the State Lottery Fund 25
180180 established under Subtitle 1 of this title shall be distributed on a monthly basis, on a 26
181181 properly approved transmittal prepared by the Commission AS FOLLOWS: 27
182182
183183 (I) 93.75% to the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future Fund established 28
184184 under § 5–206 of the Education Article; AND 29
185185
186186 (II) 6.25% TO THE PROBLEM GAMBLING FUND ESTABLISHED 30
187187 UNDER § 9–1A–33 OF THIS TITLE. 31
188188 HOUSE BILL 1029 5
189189
190190
191191 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1
192192 1, 2024. 2
193193