Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1029 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/06/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1029*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1029 
C7, J1   	4lr2795 
    	CF SB 878 
By: Delegate Allen 
Introduced and read first time: February 5, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct certain 3 
prevalence studies concerning problem and pathological mobile gambling; altering 4 
the distribution of certain State lottery, fantasy competition, and sports wagering 5 
proceeds; and generally relating to problem gambling and the Problem Gambling 6 
Fund. 7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 8 
 Article – Health – General 9 
Section 19–804 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 12 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13 
 Article – State Government 14 
Section 9–120(b)(1)(xii) and (xiii), 9–1D–04, and 9–1E–12(b) 15 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 17 
 
BY adding to 18 
 Article – State Government 19 
Section 9–120(b)(1)(xiii) 20 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 21 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 22 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 23 
 Article – State Government 24 
 Section 9–1E–12(a) 25 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 26 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 27  2 	HOUSE BILL 1029  
 
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Health – General 3 
 
19–804. 4 
 
 (a) (1) The Secretary shall make grants from or agreements for the use of State 5 
funds, including the funds provided under § 9–1A–33 of the State Government Article, and 6 
federal funds to help public agencies or nonprofit organizations operate the network of 7 
clinically appropriate services for problem gamblers who reside in the State to provide the 8 
following: 9 
 
 (i) Inpatient and residential services; 10 
 
 (ii) Outpatient services; 11 
 
 (iii) Intensive outpatient services; 12 
 
 (iv) Continuing care services; 13 
 
 (v) Educational services; 14 
 
 (vi) Services for victims of domestic violence; and 15 
 
 (vii) Other preventive or rehabilitative services or treatment. 16 
 
 (2) Research and training that are designed to improve or extend these 17 
services are proper items of expense. 18 
 
 (b) The Secretary shall conduct [a]: 19 
 
 (1) A prevalence study and replication prevalence studies to measure the 20 
rate of problem and pathological IN–PERSON gambling in the State; AND 21 
 
 (2) A PREVALENCE STUDY AND REPLICATION PREVALEN CE STUDIES 22 
TO MEASURE THE RATE OF PROBLEM AND PATHOLOGICAL MOBILE GAMBLING IN 23 
THE STATE. 24 
 
 (c) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, the Secretary shall contract 25 
with an independent researcher to conduct the prevalence studies. 26 
 
 (2) The Secretary shall utilize the most current psychiatric or diagnostic 27 
criteria for problem and pathological gambling as the basis for the prevalence studies. 28 
   	HOUSE BILL 1029 	3 
 
 
 (d) (1) The initial prevalence study ON PROBLEM AND PATHO LOGICAL  1 
IN–PERSON GAMBLING IN T HE STATE shall be completed on or before July 1, 2009. 2 
 
 (2) THE INITIAL PREVALENC E STUDY ON PROBLEM A	ND 3 
PATHOLOGICAL MOBILE GAMBLING IN THE STATE SHALL BE COMPLE TED ON OR 4 
BEFORE JULY 1, 2029. 5 
 
 (e) Replication prevalence studies shall be conducted no less than every 5 years 6 
with measures taken to permit comparisons between the initial prevalence study and 7 
subsequent replication prevalence studies. 8 
 
 (f) Services under this subtitle shall be provided by public agencies or, under 9 
contract, by nonprofit organizations. 10 
 
Article – State Government 11 
 
9–120. 12 
 
 (b) (1) By the end of the month following collection, the Comptroller shall 13 
deposit, cause to be deposited, or pay: 14 
 
 (xii) after June 30, 2023, into the Prince George’s County Blue Line 15 
Corridor Facility Fund established under § 10–657.6 of the Economic Development Article 16 
from the money that remains in the State Lottery Fund from the proceeds of all lotteries 17 
after the distributions under subsection (a) of this section and items (i) through (xi) of this 18 
paragraph, an amount not to exceed $27,000,000 to be paid in two installments not later 19 
than November 1 and June 1 of each fiscal year; [and] 20 
 
 (XIII) AFTER JUNE 30, 2024, INTO THE PROBLEM GAMBLING 21 
FUND ESTABLISHED UNDE R § 9–1A–33 OF THIS TITLE, 1% OF THE MONEY THAT 22 
REMAINS IN THE STATE LOTTERY FUND FROM THE PROCEED S OF ALL LOTTERIES 23 
EACH FISCAL YEAR , EXCEPT FROM THE INST ANT TICKET LOTTERY M ACHINES 24 
UNDER § 9–112 OF THIS SUBTITLE, AFTER THE DISTRIBUTI ONS UNDER SUBSECTION 25 
(A) OF THIS SECTION AND ITEMS (I) THROUGH (XII) OF THIS PARAGRAPH ; AND 26 
 
 [(xiii)] (XIV) into the General Fund of the State the money that remains 27 
in the State Lottery Fund from the proceeds of all lotteries after the distributions under 28 
subsection (a) of this section and items (i) through [(xii)] (XIII) of this paragraph. 29 
 
9–1D–04. 30 
 
 (a) A fantasy competition operator shall retain [85%] 84% of the proceeds and 31 
pay the remainder to the Commission. 32 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 1029  
 
 
 (b) [The Commission shall distribute the proceeds paid ] FROM THE 1 
REMAINDER OF THE PRO CEEDS PAID TO THE COMMISSION under subsection (a) of this 2 
section, THE COMMISSION SHALL PAY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNT S: 3 
 
 (1) 93.75% to the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future Fund established under 4 
§ 5–206 of the Education Article; AND 5 
 
 (2) 6.25% TO THE PROBLEM GAMBLING FUND ESTABLISHED UNDE R 6 
§ 9–1A–33 OF THIS TITLE. 7 
 
9–1E–12. 8 
 
 (a) (1) The Commission shall account to the Comptroller for all of the revenue 9 
under this subtitle. 10 
 
 (2) The proceeds from sports wagering, less the amount retained by the 11 
licensee under subsection (b)(1) of this section, shall be under the control of the Comptroller 12 
and distributed as provided under subsection (b) of this section. 13 
 
 (b) (1) (i) Except as provided in subparagraphs (ii), (iii), and (iv) of this 14 
paragraph, all proceeds from sports wagering shall be electronically transferred monthly 15 
into the State Lottery Fund established under Subtitle 1 of this title. 16 
 
 (ii) A Class A–1 and A–2 sports wagering facility licensee shall 17 
retain [85%] 84% of the proceeds from sports wagering conducted at the locations described 18 
in § 9–1E–09(a) of this subtitle. 19 
 
 (iii) A Class B–1 and B–2 sports wagering facility licensee shall 20 
retain [85%] 84% of the proceeds from sports wagering conducted at the location described 21 
in the licensee’s application. 22 
 
 (iv) A mobile sports wagering licensee shall retain [85%] 84% of the 23 
proceeds from online sports wagering received by the licensee. 24 
 
 (2) All proceeds from sports wagering in the State Lottery Fund 25 
established under Subtitle 1 of this title shall be distributed on a monthly basis, on a 26 
properly approved transmittal prepared by the Commission AS FOLLOWS: 27 
 
 (I) 93.75% to the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future Fund established 28 
under § 5–206 of the Education Article; AND 29 
 
 (II) 6.25% TO THE PROBLEM GAMBLING FUND ESTABLISHED 30 
UNDER § 9–1A–33 OF THIS TITLE. 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 1029 	5 
 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1 
1, 2024. 2