House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-35) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (31-11) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {723824/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (113-23) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {893428/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |