Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1082 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/02/2024

                             	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 336 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 336 
(House Bill 1082) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Blueprint for Maryland’s Future Implementation – Funding and Independent 
Evaluation – Alterations for Implementation Coordinators 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, for certain fiscal years, each county board of education to 
provide for the salary and benefits of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future 
implementation coordinator in the county; requiring the funding for the salary and 
benefits of the implementation coordinator to be paid for by the State and the county 
in a certain proportion; altering the dates by which the entity contracted by the 
Accountability and Implementation Board to perform an independent evaluation of 
the implementation of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future is required to report to 
the Board and the Board is required to report to the Governor and the General 
Assembly; altering certain funding requirements under certain circumstances; and 
generally relating to the implementation of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future. 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 
 Article – Education 
Section 5–404(b)(2) and 5–410(a) and (b) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – Education 
Section 5–404(h) and 5–410(c) and (d) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Chapter 36 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2021 
 Section 16(d) through (f) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Education 
 
5–404. 
 
 (b) (2) State and local government units responsible for implementing an 
element of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future shall develop implementation plans 
consistent with the Comprehensive Implementation Plan that describe the goals, 
objectives, and strategies that will be used to improve student achievement and meet the  Ch. 336 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
Blueprint for Maryland’s Future recommendations for each segment of the student 
population. 
 
 (h) (1) For each of fiscal years 2022 through 2026 FISCAL YEAR, the governing 
body of a county and the local school system jointly shall appoint a single implementation 
coordinator responsible for the implementation of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future by 
all government units operating in the county. 
 
 (2) FOR EACH OF FISCAL YEARS 2026 AND 2027 FISCAL YEAR, EACH 
COUNTY BOARD SHALL P ROVIDE $150,000 FOR THE SALARY AND B ENEFITS OF THE 
IMPLEMENTATION COORD INATOR APPOINTED IN ACCORDANCE WITH PARA GRAPH 
(1) OF THIS SUBSECTION . 
 
 (3) FUNDING FOR THE SALAR	Y AND BENEFITS OF TH	E 
IMPLEMENTATION COORD INATOR PROVIDED BY T HE COUNTY BOARD IN 
ACCORDANCE WITH PARA GRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL BE PAID BY THE 
STATE AND THE COUNTY IN THE SAME PROPORTION AS T HE FOUNDATION PROGRA M 
UNDER § 5–213 OF THIS TITLE. 
 
5–410. 
 
 (a) In addition to its own assessments and tracking of progress, required under § 
5–406 of this subtitle, the Board shall contract with a public or private entity to conduct an 
independent evaluation of the State’s progress in implementing the Blueprint for 
Maryland’s Future and achieving the expected outcomes during the implementation period. 
 
 (b) The independent evaluation shall include an assessment of: 
 
 (1) The use of additional funding to meet the goals of the Blueprint for 
Maryland’s Future; 
 
 (2) Progress toward the goals of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future and 
whether the goals have been achieved; and 
 
 (3) Any recommendations to alter the goals or strategies employed to reach 
the goals, including new uses for existing funds or additional funding. 
 
 (c) (1) An entity with which the Board contracts for an independent evaluation 
shall report its results to the Board on or before: 
 
 (i) [October 1, 2024] DECEMBER 1, 2026; and 
 
 (ii) October 1, 2030. 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 336 
 
– 3 – 
 (2) The Board shall contract for each independent evaluation as soon as 
practicable. 
 
 (d) (1) (i) On or before [December 1, 2024] JANUARY 15, 2027, the Board 
shall, using the first independent evaluation and its own judgment, report to the Governor 
and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly 
on whether the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future is being implemented as intended and 
achieving the expected outcomes. 
 
 (ii) The Board’s report shall include an assessment of the State’s 
progress towards: 
 
 1. Increasing the number of teachers achieving National 
Board Certification; 
 
 2. Providing full–day prekindergarten programs for 3– and 
4–year–olds in accordance with Title 7, Subtitle 1A of this article; 
 
 3. Improving behavioral health services in accordance with § 
7–447 of this article; and 
 
 4. Ensuring that students enrolled in public schools meet 
college and career standards in accordance with § 7–205.1 of this article. 
 
 (iii) The Board’s report shall include any legislative or structural 
corrections necessary to fully implement the Blueprint. 
 
 (2) On or before December 1, 2030, the Board shall report on the results of 
the final independent evaluation to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 
State Government Article, the General Assembly. 
 
 (3) The Board’s reports under this subsection shall include: 
 
 (i) Practices being used to close achievement gaps between students 
of different groups listed in § 5–408(a)(2)(i) of this subtitle; 
 
 (ii) Progress made in closing the achievement gaps listed under item 
(i) of this paragraph; and 
 
 (iii) Assessments of student outcomes listed under § 5–408(a)(2)(ii) of 
this subtitle, disaggregated by race, income, ethnicity, and gender. 
 
Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2021 
 
 SECTION 16. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 
  Ch. 336 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 (d) In the independent evaluation and report to be submitted to the Governor and 
the General Assembly on or before [December 1, 2024] JANUARY 15, 2027, as required 
under § 5–410(d)(1) of the Education Article as enacted by this Act, the Accountability and 
Implementation Board shall report whether the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future is being 
implemented as intended and is achieving expected outcomes. 
 
 (e) (1) If the Accountability and Implementation Board does not report that 
the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future is being implemented as intended and is achieving 
expected outcomes in accordance with subsection (d) of this section, then: 
 
 (i) notwithstanding any other provision of law, per pupil increases 
in major education aid required under this Act for the fiscal year [2026] 2028 and each 
year thereafter shall be limited to the rate of inflation, as defined by § 5–201(h) of the 
Education Article as enacted by this Act; 
 
 (ii) notwithstanding any other provision of law, any additional 
funding increases required under this Act shall be limited to the rate of inflation as defined 
in § 5–201(h) of the Education Article as enacted by this Act; and 
 
 (iii) subject to subsection (f) of this section and notwithstanding any 
other provision of law, local school systems are not required to meet the additional 
requirements of this Act that begin in fiscal year [2026] 2028 and each fiscal year 
thereafter. 
 
 (2) If the Accountability and Implementation Board reports that the 
Blueprint for Maryland’s Future is not being implemented as intended and is not achieving 
expected outcomes, it is the intent of the General Assembly that the General Assembly 
shall take immediate action to adjust the formula and policies under this Act to achieve the 
goals of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future in order to fulfill the General Assembly’s 
commitment to provide the resources, supports, and funding to fully implement the 
Blueprint for Maryland’s Future. 
 
 (f) A local school system shall continue to fund the requirements of this Act in 
effect prior to fiscal year [2026] 2028. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 
1, 2024.  
 
Approved by the Governor, April 25, 2024.