House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (98-35) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-13) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {573526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (100-38) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {763125/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |