Senate | 04/08/2024 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-5) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {353026/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |