House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (33-7) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (105-26) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {833022/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |