11 | | - | FOR the purpose of prohibiting, on or after a certain date, a person from using installing, |
---|
12 | | - | supplying, selling, soliciting, or offering for sale playground surfacing materials that |
---|
13 | | - | contain a certain concentration of lead or a component product, material, or |
---|
14 | | - | substance to which PFAS chemicals were previously intentionally added for certain |
---|
15 | | - | purposes certain concentrations of certain chemicals for the construction or |
---|
16 | | - | renovation of the ground surface of a playground in the State; prohibiting a county, |
---|
17 | | - | municipality, or unit of local government from adopting any ordinance, rule, or |
---|
18 | | - | regulation related to the use of certain playground surfacing materials that is less |
---|
19 | | - | stringent than the requirements of this Act; requiring a certain manufacturer to |
---|
20 | | - | establish and provide to the Department of the Environment a certain certificate of |
---|
21 | | - | compliance under certain circumstances; and generally relating to playground |
---|
22 | | - | surfacing materials. |
---|
| 13 | + | By: Delegates Guyton, Lehman, Allen, Ebersole, Forbes, Holmes, Pasteur, Ruth, |
---|
| 14 | + | and Stein Stein, Foley, Love, and Terrasa |
---|
| 15 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2024 |
---|
| 16 | + | Assigned to: Environment and Transportation |
---|
| 17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable with amendments |
---|
| 18 | + | House action: Adopted |
---|
| 19 | + | Read second time: March 5, 2024 |
---|
36 | | - | SUBTITLE 16A. PLAYGROUND SURFACING MATERIALS. |
---|
| 27 | + | FOR the purpose of prohibiting, on or after a certain date, a person from using installing, 3 |
---|
| 28 | + | supplying, selling, soliciting, or offering for sale playground surfacing materials that 4 |
---|
| 29 | + | contain a certain concentration of lead or a component product, material, or 5 |
---|
| 30 | + | substance to which PFAS chemicals were previously intentionally added for certain 6 |
---|
| 31 | + | purposes certain concentrations of certain chemicals for the construction or 7 |
---|
| 32 | + | renovation of the ground surface of a playground in the State; prohibiting a county, 8 |
---|
| 33 | + | municipality, or unit of local government from adopting any ordinance, rule, or 9 |
---|
| 34 | + | regulation related to the use of certain playground surfacing materials that is less 10 |
---|
| 35 | + | stringent than the requirements of this Act; requiring a certain manufacturer to 11 |
---|
| 36 | + | establish and provide to the Department of the Environment a certain certificate of 12 |
---|
| 37 | + | compliance under certain circumstances; and generally relating to playground 13 |
---|
| 38 | + | surfacing materials. 14 |
---|
60 | | - | (A) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN THIS SECTION, THIS SUBTITLE DOES N OT LIMIT |
---|
61 | | - | THE POWER OF A COUNT Y, MUNICIPALITY, OR UNIT OF LOCAL GOV ERNMENT TO |
---|
62 | | - | ADOPT ORDINANCES , RULES, OR REGULATIONS RELAT ED TO PLAYGROUND |
---|
63 | | - | SURFACING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN PAH, PFAS, PFAS CHEMICALS OR LEAD. |
---|
| 58 | + | (A) IN THIS SUBTITLE THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 4 |
---|
| 59 | + | INDICATED. 5 |
---|
70 | | - | (C) THIS SUBTITLE DOES NO T AFFECT THE AUTHORI TY OF A COUNTY , |
---|
71 | | - | MUNICIPALITY, OR UNIT OF LOCAL GOV ERNMENT TO ENACT AND ENFORCE |
---|
72 | | - | STANDARDS OR REQUIRE MENTS RELATED TO PLA YGROUND SURFACING MA TERIALS |
---|
73 | | - | THAT CONTAIN PAH, PFAS, PFAS CHEMICALS OR LEAD THAT ARE MORE |
---|
74 | | - | STRINGENT THAN THE R EQUIREMENTS OF THIS SUBTITLE. |
---|
| 63 | + | (C) (B) “PFAS CHEMICALS” MEANS A CLASS OF FLUORINAT ED ORGANIC 7 |
---|
| 64 | + | CHEMICALS THAT CONTA IN AT LEAST ONE FULL Y FLUORINATED CARBON ATOM, 8 |
---|
| 65 | + | INCLUDING PER– AND POLYFLUOROALKYL SUBSTANCES. 9 |
---|
78 | | - | (A) ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2024, A PERSON MAY NOT USE INSTALL, |
---|
79 | | - | SUPPLY, SELL, SOLICIT, OR OFFER FOR SALE IN THE STATE PLAYGROUND |
---|
80 | | - | SURFACING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN : |
---|
| 70 | + | (E) (D) “PLAYGROUND SURFACING MATERIALS” MEANS PRODUCTS , 12 |
---|
| 71 | + | MATERIALS, OR SUBSTANCES USED O R INSTALLED ON THE G ROUND SURFACE OF A 13 |
---|
| 72 | + | PLAYGROUND IN THE STATE THAT COME INTO DIREC T CONTACT WITH A PER SON. 14 |
---|
84 | | - | (2) A COMPONENT PRODUCT , MATERIAL, OR SUBSTANCE TO WHIC H |
---|
85 | | - | PFAS CHEMICALS WERE PREVI OUSLY INTENTIONALLY ADDED IN THE FORMATI ON |
---|
86 | | - | OF THAT COMPONENT WH ERE THE CONTINUED PR ESENCE OF THE PFAS |
---|
87 | | - | CHEMICALS WAS DESIRE D IN THE COMPONENT T O PROVIDE A SPECIFIC |
---|
88 | | - | CHARACTERISTIC . |
---|
| 76 | + | (A) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN T HIS SECTION, THIS SUBTITLE DOES N OT LIMIT 16 |
---|
| 77 | + | THE POWER OF A COUNT Y, MUNICIPALITY, OR UNIT OF LOCAL GOV ERNMENT TO 17 |
---|
| 78 | + | ADOPT ORDINANCES , RULES, OR REGULATIONS RELAT ED TO PLAYGROUND 18 |
---|
| 79 | + | SURFACING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN PAH, PFAS, PFAS CHEMICALS OR LEAD. 19 |
---|
90 | | - | (2) FLUORINATED ORGANIC C HEMICALS THAT CONTAI N AT LEAST 1 |
---|
91 | | - | FULLY FLUORINATED CA RBON ATOM, INCLUDING PFAS SUBSTANCES; AND |
---|
| 81 | + | (B) A COUNTY, MUNICIPALITY, OR UNIT OF LOCAL GOV ERNMENT MAY NOT 20 |
---|
| 82 | + | ADOPT ANY ORDINANCE , RULE, OR REGULATION RELATE D TO PLAYGROUND 21 |
---|
| 83 | + | SURFACING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN PAH, PFAS, PFAS CHEMICALS OR LEAD 22 |
---|
| 84 | + | THAT IS LESS STRINGE NT THAN THE REQUIREM ENTS OF THIS SUBTITLE. 23 |
---|
93 | | - | (3) MORE THAN 20 MILLIGRAMS PER KILOG RAM OF PAH. WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 488 |
---|
| 86 | + | (C) THIS SUBTITLE DOES NO T AFFECT THE AUTHORI TY OF A COUNTY , 24 |
---|
| 87 | + | MUNICIPALITY, OR UNIT OF LOCAL GOV ERNMENT TO ENACT AND ENFORCE 25 |
---|
| 88 | + | STANDARDS OR REQUIRE MENTS RELATED TO PLA YGROUND SURFACING MA TERIALS 26 |
---|
| 89 | + | THAT CONTAIN PAH, PFAS, PFAS CHEMICALS OR LEAD THAT A RE MORE 27 |
---|
| 90 | + | STRINGENT THAN THE R EQUIREMENTS OF THIS SUBTITLE. 28 |
---|
103 | | - | (C) ON REQUEST OF THE DEPARTMENT AND WITHIN 30 DAYS AFTER THE |
---|
104 | | - | REQUEST IS MADE , A MANUFACTURER SHALL PROVIDE THE CERTIFIC ATE OF |
---|
105 | | - | COMPLIANCE ESTABLISH ED UNDER SUBSECTION (B) OF THIS SECTION TO T HE |
---|
106 | | - | DEPARTMENT . |
---|
| 96 | + | (A) ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2024, A PERSON MAY NOT USE INSTALL, 1 |
---|
| 97 | + | SUPPLY, SELL, SOLICIT, OR OFFER FOR SALE IN THE STATE PLAYGROUND 2 |
---|
| 98 | + | SURFACING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN : 3 |
---|
139 | | - | Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024. |
---|
| 138 | + | (3) ANY ORDER ISSUED UNDE R THIS SUBTITLE. 30 |
---|
| 139 | + | 4 HOUSE BILL 1147 |
---|
| 140 | + | |
---|
| 141 | + | |
---|
| 142 | + | (B) A PERSON WHO VIOLATES THIS SUBTITLE IS SUB JECT TO: 1 |
---|
| 143 | + | |
---|
| 144 | + | (1) A CIVIL PENALTY UP TO $2,500 FOR EACH VIOLATION ; OR 2 |
---|
| 145 | + | |
---|
| 146 | + | (2) AN ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY UP TO $2,500 FOR EACH 3 |
---|
| 147 | + | VIOLATION, BUT NOT EXCEEDING $100,000 TOTAL. 4 |
---|
| 148 | + | |
---|
| 149 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall be construed to 5 |
---|
| 150 | + | apply only prospectively and may not be applied or interpreted to have any effect on or 6 |
---|
| 151 | + | application to any contract awarded for the installation, supply, sale, solicitation, or offer 7 |
---|
| 152 | + | for sale of playground surfacing materials before the effective date of this Act. 8 |
---|
| 153 | + | |
---|
| 154 | + | SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 9 |
---|
| 155 | + | October 1, 2024. 10 |
---|
| 156 | + | |
---|
| 157 | + | |
---|
| 158 | + | |
---|
| 159 | + | |
---|
| 160 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 161 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
| 162 | + | Governor. |
---|
| 163 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
| 164 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. |
---|
| 165 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
| 166 | + | President of the Senate. |
---|