House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 933 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (121-10) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {763029/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (112-14) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {193022/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |