Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {533422/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |