Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1237 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/15/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1237*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1237 
F5   	4lr3353 
      
By: Delegates Miller, Arentz, Buckel, Chisholm, Grammer, Griffith, Hornberger, 
Kipke, McComas, Rose, and Stonko Stonko, Atterbeary, Attar, Ebersole, 
Fair, Feldmark, Grossman, Hartman, Henson, R. Long, Mireku–North, 
Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Roberts, Vogel, Wells, Wilkins, Wims, Wu, and 
Young 
Introduced and read first time: February 8, 2024 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 5, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
State Department of Education – Task Force to Study the Maryland Online IEP 2 
Special Education System 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Task Force to Study the Maryland Online IEP Special 4 
Education System; and generally relating to the Task Force to Study the Maryland 5 
Online IEP Special Education System. 6 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 7 
That: 8 
 
 (a) (1) In this section, “system” means the Maryland Online IEP Special 9 
Education System. 10 
 
 (2) “System” includes: 11 
 
 (i) the Maryland Online Individualized Education Program; and 12 
 
 (ii) the Maryland Online Individualized Family Service Plan.  13 
 
 (b) There is a Task Force to Study the Maryland Online IEP Special Education 14 
System. 15  2 	HOUSE BILL 1237  
 
 
 
 (c) The Task Force consists of: 1 
 
 (1) the Assistant State Superintendent of Early Intervention and Special 2 
Education Services, or the Assistant State Superintendent’s designee; 3 
 
 (2) the Chief Information Officer of the Office of Information Technology in 4 
the State Department of Education, or the Chief Information Officer’s designee; and 5 
 
 (3) the following members, appointed by the State Superintendent of 6 
Schools: 7 
 
 (i) three general education public school teachers, representing an 8 
urban, a suburban, and a rural local school system; 9 
 
 (ii) three special education public school teachers, representing a 10 
large, medium, and small local school system; 11 
 
 (iii) three experienced Individualized Family Service Plan 12 
coordinators;  13 
 
 (iii) (iv) one representative of the Maryland State Educators 14 
Education Association; 15 
 
 (iv) (v) one representative of a special education advocacy 16 
organization; and 17 
 
 (v) (vi) two parents of students enrolled in a public school that 18 
have an individualized education program. 19 
 
 (d) The State Superintendent shall designate the chair of the Task Force. 20 
 
 (e) The State Department of Education shall provide staff for the Task Force. 21 
 
 (f) A member of the Task Force: 22 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Task Force; but 23 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 24 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 25 
 
 (g) The Task Force shall: 26 
 
 (1) study the effectiveness, functionality, and usability of the Maryland 27 
Online IEP System Individualized Education Program and the Maryland Online 28 
Individualized Family Service Plan; 29 
   	HOUSE BILL 1237 	3 
 
 
 (2) determine the availability of other platforms and how other platforms 1 
compare to the current system in terms of effectiveness, functionality, usability, and cost; 2 
 
 (3) evaluate the costs of maintaining or upgrading the current system or 3 
purchasing or leasing another platform; and 4 
 
 (4) make recommendations to maintain and upgrade the system or replace 5 
the system with another platform as determined by the Task Force. 6 
 
 (h) On or before June 1, 2025, the Task Force shall report its findings and 7 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 8 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 9 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 10 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 11 
Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 12 
further force and effect. 13 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.