Senate | 04/08/2024 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {973725/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |