Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1263 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/05/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1263*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1263 
J3   	4lr3319 
    	CF SB 952 
By: Delegate Pasteur Delegates Pasteur, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, 
Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, 
R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena–Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, 
Szeliga, Taveras, and White Holland 
Introduced and read first time: February 8, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 24, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Assisted Living Programs – Assisted Living Referrers – Requirements and 2 
Prohibitions 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing certain requirements for assisted living referrers, 4 
including requirements related to the maintenance of general liability insurance, 5 
criminal history records checks, and the maintenance and provision of certain 6 
agreements and documents, and assisted living program tours descriptions of 7 
services; prohibiting an assisted living referrer from requesting payment for a 8 
referral after a certain time period; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to 9 
maintain a certain database of approved assisted living programs for a certain 10 
purpose; requiring an assisted living referrer to comply with certain data privacy 11 
requirements on certain dates; and generally relating to assisted living referrers and 12 
assisted living programs.  13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Health – General 15 
Section 19–1813 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20  2 	HOUSE BILL 1263  
 
 
 
Article – Health – General 1 
 
19–1813. 2 
 
 (a) In this section, “assisted living referrer” means an individual or agency that: 3 
 
 (1) Makes referrals to assisted living programs without cost to the person 4 
receiving the referral; and 5 
 
 (2) Is compensated by an assisted living program or other third party for 6 
referring individuals to a licensed assisted living program. 7 
 
 (b) Each assisted living referrer: 8 
 
 (1) Shall register with the Office of Health Care Quality; 9 
 
 (2) Shall disclose to a client or potential client of the assisted living referrer 10 
all financial relationships the assisted living referrer has with assisted living programs; 11 
 
 (3) If referring a client or potential client to an assisted living program, 12 
shall affirm that the assisted living program is licensed; 13 
 
 (4) If referring a client or potential client to an assisted living program, 14 
may refer the client or potential client only to a licensed assisted living program; [and] 15 
 
 (5) SHALL MAINTAIN GENERA L LIABILITY INSURANCE; 16 
 
 (6) SHALL REQUIRE EMPLOYE ES TO OBTAIN A CRIMI NAL HISTORY 17 
RECORDS CHECK ;  18 
 
 (7) SHALL SIGN A FEDERAL HEALTH INSURANCE PORTABILITY AND 19 
ACCOUNTABILITY ACT AGREEMENT WITH TH E CLIENT OR THE CLIE NT’S 20 
REPRESENTATIVE ; 21 
 
 (8) SHALL MAINTAIN A SIGN ED, WRITTEN, AND DATED DOCUMENT 22 
BETWEEN THE ASSISTED LIVING REFERRER AND THE CLIENT OR THE CL IENT’S 23 
REPRESENTATIVE OUTLI NING THE TERMS OF AS SISTANCE PROVIDED BY THE 24 
ASSISTED LIVING REFE RRER; AND 25 
 
 (7) SHALL PROVIDE TO THE 	CLIENT OR THE CLIENT ’S 26 
REPRESENTATIVE A DESCRIPTION OF THE SERVICES THAT WILL B E PROVIDED BY 27 
THE REFERRER ; 28 
 
 (8) IF THE REFERRER HAS A FINANCIAL AGREEMENT WITH THE 29 
CLIENT OR THE CLIENT ’S REPRESENTATIVE , SHALL PROVIDE THE AG REEMENT TO 30   	HOUSE BILL 1263 	3 
 
 
THE CLIENT OR THE CL IENT’S REPRESENTATIVE IN WRITING OR BY ELECTRONIC 1 
MEANS; AND  2 
 
 [(5)] (9) Shall notify the Office of Health Care Quality immediately on 3 
learning that the assisted living program is operating without a license. 4 
 
 (C) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , AN ASSISTED 5 
LIVING REFERRER MAKING A REFERRAL TO AN ASSISTED LIVING P ROGRAM SHALL 6 
ARRANGE AND FACILITA TE A TOUR OF THE ASS ISTED LIVING PROGRAM FOR THE 7 
CLIENT AND THE CLIEN T’S FAMILY. 8 
 
 (2) DURING THE TOUR REQUI RED UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS 9 
SUBSECTION, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ASSISTED LIVING REFE RRER AND A 10 
REPRESENTATIVE OF TH E ASSISTED LIVING PR OGRAM SHALL BE PRESE NT. 11 
 
 [(c)] (D) An assisted living referrer may not: 12 
 
 (1) Receive funding from the Department if the assisted living referrer is 13 
in violation of this subtitle; [or] 14 
 
 (2) Make referrals only to licensed assisted living programs from which the 15 
assisted living referrer receives compensation as described in subsection (a)(2) of this 16 
section; OR 17 
 
 (3) REQUEST PAYMENT OF A REFERRAL FEE FROM AN ASSISTED 18 
LIVING PROGRAM M ORE THAN 1 YEAR 2 YEARS AFTER THE ASSISTED L IVING 19 
REFERRER PROVIDED TH E REFERRAL.  20 
 
 [(d)] (E) If requested by any person or on its own initiative, the Office of the 21 
Attorney General may investigate whether an assisted living referrer violated this subtitle 22 
and may seek appropriate relief. 23 
 
 (F) (E) THE OFFICE OF HEALTH CARE QUALITY SHALL MAINTAI N A  24 
USER–FRIENDLY DATABASE OF LICENSED ASSISTED LI VING PROGRAMS AND 25 
ENSURE THAT EACH ASS ISTED LIVING REFERRE R HAS ACCESS TO THE DATABASE.  26 
 
 (F) (1) ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 30, 2025, AN ASSISTED LIVING 27 
REFERRER: 28 
 
 (I) SHALL KEEP A CLIENT ’S OR POTENTIAL CLIEN T’S MEDICAL 29 
RECORD, AS DEFINED IN § 4–301 OF THIS ARTICLE , CONFIDENTIAL AND MAY 30 
DISCLOSE THE MEDICAL RECORD ONLY FOR THE PURPOSE OF MAKING A REFERRAL 31 
IF THE CLIENT OR POTENTIAL CL IENT GIVES INFORMED WRITTEN, ELECTRONIC, OR 32 
AUDIO RECORDED CONSE NT; AND 33 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 1263  
 
 
 (II) MAY NOT SELL THE PERS ONAL DATA OF A CLIEN T, 1 
POTENTIAL CLIENT , OR CLIENT’S REPRESENTATIVE TO ANOTHER PERSON UNLES S 2 
THE CLIENT OR THE CL IENT’S REPRESENTATIVE GIVES INFORMED WRITT EN, 3 
ELECTRONIC, OR AUDIO RECORDED CO NSENT. 4 
 
 (2) ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2025, AN ASSISTED LIVING R EFERRER 5 
SHALL COMPLY WITH AL L APPLICABLE DATA PR IVACY LAWS.  6 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 7 
October 1, 2024.  8 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.