House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Pre-filed |