Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 287 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 287 | |
5 | - | (House Bill 13) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *hb0013* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Residential Property – Affordable Housing Land Trusts – Authority to Establish | |
10 | - | Condominium Regimes | |
10 | + | HOUSE BILL 13 | |
11 | + | N1 4lr0744 | |
12 | + | HB 567/23 – ENT (PRE–FILED) CF SB 199 | |
13 | + | By: Delegate R. Lewis | |
14 | + | Requested: September 28, 2023 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Environment and Transportation | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | House action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 8, 2024 | |
11 | 20 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of authorizing a condominium regime to be established on certain | |
13 | - | property owned by an affordable housing land trust; and generally relating to the | |
14 | - | authority to establish condominium regimes. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
15 | 22 | ||
16 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
17 | - | Article – Real Property | |
18 | - | Section 11–102(a) | |
19 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
20 | - | (2023 Replacement Volume) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
21 | 24 | ||
22 | - | ||
23 | - | ||
25 | + | Residential Property – Affordable Housing Land Trusts – Authority to Establish 2 | |
26 | + | Condominium Regimes 3 | |
24 | 27 | ||
25 | - | Article – Real Property | |
28 | + | FOR the purpose of authorizing a condominium regime to be established on certain 4 | |
29 | + | property owned by an affordable housing land trust; and generally relating to the 5 | |
30 | + | authority to establish condominium regimes. 6 | |
26 | 31 | ||
27 | - | 11–102. | |
32 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 | |
33 | + | Article – Real Property 8 | |
34 | + | Section 11–102(a) 9 | |
35 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 10 | |
36 | + | (2023 Replacement Volume) 11 | |
28 | 37 | ||
29 | - | (a) (1) The fee simple owner or lessee under a lease that exceeds 60 years of | |
30 | - | any property in the State may subject the property to a condominium regime by recording | |
31 | - | among the land records of the county where the property is located, a declaration, bylaws, | |
32 | - | and condominium plat that comply with the requirements specified in this title. | |
38 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12 | |
39 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13 | |
33 | 40 | ||
34 | - | (2) (i) Notwithstanding the provisions of paragraph (1) of this | |
35 | - | subsection, a leasehold estate may not be subjected to a condominium regime if it is used | |
36 | - | for residential purposes unless the State, a county that has adopted charter home rule | |
37 | - | under Article XI–A of the Maryland Constitution, a municipal corporation, AN | |
38 | - | AFFORDABLE HOUSING L AND TRUST AS DEFINED IN § 14–501 OF THIS ARTICLE, or, | |
39 | - | subject to the provisions of subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph, the Washington | |
40 | - | Metropolitan Area Transit Authority is the owner of the reversionary fee simple estate. | |
41 | + | Article – Real Property 14 | |
41 | 42 | ||
42 | - | (ii) The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority may | |
43 | - | establish a leasehold estate for a condominium regime that is used for residential purposes | |
44 | - | under subparagraph (i) of this paragraph if, when the initial term of the lease expires, there | |
45 | - | is a provision in the lease that allows the lessee to automatically renew the lease for another | |
46 | - | term. | |
43 | + | 11–102. 15 | |
47 | 44 | ||
48 | - | (3) Notwithstanding paragraph (2) of this subsection or any declaration, Ch. 287 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
45 | + | (a) (1) The fee simple owner or lessee under a lease that exceeds 60 years of 16 | |
46 | + | any property in the State may subject the property to a condominium regime by recording 17 | |
47 | + | among the land records of the county where the property is located, a declaration, bylaws, 18 | |
48 | + | and condominium plat that comply with the requirements specified in this title. 19 2 HOUSE BILL 13 | |
49 | 49 | ||
50 | - | – 2 – | |
51 | - | rule, or bylaw, a developer or any other person may not be prohibited from granting a | |
52 | - | leasehold estate in an individual unit used for residential purposes. | |
53 | 50 | ||
54 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
55 | - | October 1, 2024. | |
56 | 51 | ||
57 | - | Approved by the Governor, April 25, 2024. | |
52 | + | (2) (i) Notwithstanding the provisions of paragraph (1) of this 1 | |
53 | + | subsection, a leasehold estate may not be subjected to a condominium regime if it is used 2 | |
54 | + | for residential purposes unless the State, a county that has adopted charter home rule 3 | |
55 | + | under Article XI–A of the Maryland Constitution, a municipal corporation, AN 4 | |
56 | + | AFFORDABLE HOUSING L AND TRUST AS DEFINED IN § 14–501 OF THIS ARTICLE, or, 5 | |
57 | + | subject to the provisions of subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph, the Washington 6 | |
58 | + | Metropolitan Area Transit Authority is the owner of the reversionary fee simple estate. 7 | |
59 | + | ||
60 | + | (ii) The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority may 8 | |
61 | + | establish a leasehold estate for a condominium regime that is used for residential purposes 9 | |
62 | + | under subparagraph (i) of this paragraph if, when the initial term of the lease expires, there 10 | |
63 | + | is a provision in the lease that allows the lessee to automatically renew the lease for another 11 | |
64 | + | term. 12 | |
65 | + | ||
66 | + | (3) Notwithstanding paragraph (2) of this subsection or any declaration, 13 | |
67 | + | rule, or bylaw, a developer or any other person may not be prohibited from granting a 14 | |
68 | + | leasehold estate in an individual unit used for residential purposes. 15 | |
69 | + | ||
70 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 16 | |
71 | + | October 1, 2024. 17 | |
72 | + | ||
73 | + | ||
74 | + | ||
75 | + | ||
76 | + | Approved: | |
77 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
78 | + | Governor. | |
79 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
80 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. | |
81 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
82 | + | President of the Senate. |