1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *hb1428* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | HOUSE BILL 1428 |
---|
8 | 8 | | E4 4lr2911 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Delegate Miller |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2024 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Judiciary |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Public Safety – Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | FOR the purpose of establishing the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission; 3 |
---|
21 | 21 | | and generally relating to the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission. 4 |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | BY adding to 5 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Article – Public Safety 6 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Section 3–531 7 |
---|
26 | 26 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 8 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 9 |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 |
---|
30 | 30 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | Article – Public Safety 12 |
---|
33 | 33 | | |
---|
34 | 34 | | 3–531. 13 |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | (A) IN THIS SECTION, “COMMISSION” MEANS THE ELECTRIC VEHICLE 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | CHARGING STATION SAFETY COMMISSION. 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | (B) THERE IS AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING STATION SAFETY 16 |
---|
40 | 40 | | COMMISSION. 17 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | (C) THE PUR POSE OF THE COMMISSION IS TO DEVELOP POLICY 18 |
---|
43 | 43 | | RECOMMENDATIONS TO INCREASE SAFETY FOR VEHICLE O WNERS AND PASSENGERS 19 |
---|
44 | 44 | | AND REDUCE VIOLENT CRIME AND THEFT AT ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING 20 |
---|
45 | 45 | | STATIONS. 21 |
---|
46 | 46 | | 2 HOUSE BILL 1428 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | (D) THE COMMISSION CONSISTS O F THE FOLLOWING MEMBER S: 1 |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) THE SECRETARY OF STATE POLICE, OR THE SECRETARY’S 2 |
---|
52 | 52 | | DESIGNEE; 3 |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2) THE SECRETARY OF JUVENILE SERVICES, OR THE SECRETARY’S 4 |
---|
55 | 55 | | DESIGNEE; 5 |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | (3) THE SECRETARY OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL 6 |
---|
58 | 58 | | SERVICES, OR THE SECRETARY’S DESIGNEE; 7 |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | (4) THE MOTOR VEHICLE ADMINISTRATOR ; AND 8 |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | (5) THE FOLLOWING MEMBERS, APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR: 9 |
---|
63 | 63 | | |
---|
64 | 64 | | (I) TWO REPRESENTATIVE S OF LOCAL LAW ENFORCE MENT 10 |
---|
65 | 65 | | AGENCIES, INCLUDING ONE REPRES ENTATIVE OF A COUNTY SHERIFF’S OFFICE; AND 11 |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | (II) THREE REPRESENTATIVES OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING ONE 12 |
---|
68 | 68 | | MEMBER WHO REPRESENT S A NEIGHBORHOOD OR COMM UNITY ASSOCIATION . 13 |
---|
69 | 69 | | |
---|
70 | 70 | | (E) (1) THE APPOINTED MEMBERS SERVE AT THE PLEASUR E OF THE 14 |
---|
71 | 71 | | GOVERNOR. 15 |
---|
72 | 72 | | |
---|
73 | 73 | | (2) THE TERM OF A N APPOINTED MEMBER IS 3 YEARS. 16 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | (3) THE TERMS OF THE APPOINTED MEMBERS ARE STAGGERE D AS 17 |
---|
76 | 76 | | REQUIRED IN THE TERM S PROVIDED FOR MEMBE RS OF THE COMMISSION ON 18 |
---|
77 | 77 | | OCTOBER 1, 2024. 19 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | (4) AT THE END OF A TERM , A MEMBER CONTINUES T O SERVE UNTIL 20 |
---|
80 | 80 | | A SUCCESSOR IS APPOI NTED AND QUALIFIES . 21 |
---|
81 | 81 | | |
---|
82 | 82 | | (5) A MEMBER WHO IS APPOIN TED AFTER A TERM HAS BEGUN SERVES 22 |
---|
83 | 83 | | ONLY FOR THE REST OF THE TERM AND UNTIL A SUCCESSOR IS APPOINT ED AND 23 |
---|
84 | 84 | | QUALIFIES. 24 |
---|
85 | 85 | | |
---|
86 | 86 | | (F) THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMISSION SHALL ELEC T ONE MEMBER TO 25 |
---|
87 | 87 | | SERVE AS CHAIR OF TH E COMMISSION. 26 |
---|
88 | 88 | | |
---|
89 | 89 | | (G) A MEMBER OF THE COMMISSION: 27 |
---|
90 | 90 | | HOUSE BILL 1428 3 |
---|
91 | 91 | | |
---|
92 | 92 | | |
---|
93 | 93 | | (1) MAY NOT RECEIVE COMPENSATION AS A ME MBER OF THE 1 |
---|
94 | 94 | | COMMISSION; BUT 2 |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | (2) IS ENTITLED TO REIMB URSEMENT FOR EXPENSE S UNDER THE 3 |
---|
97 | 97 | | STANDARD STATE TRAVEL REGULATIONS, AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 4 |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | (H) THE COMMISSION SHALL STUDY AND MAKE RECOM MENDATIONS ON 5 |
---|
100 | 100 | | METHODS OF INCREASIN G SAFETY FOR VEHICLE OWNERS AND PASSENGER S AND 6 |
---|
101 | 101 | | REDUCING VIOLENT CRIME AND THEFT AT ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING STATIONS , 7 |
---|
102 | 102 | | INCLUDING: 8 |
---|
103 | 103 | | |
---|
104 | 104 | | (1) IMPROVED LIGHTING; 9 |
---|
105 | 105 | | |
---|
106 | 106 | | (2) MONITORING BY SECURI TY CAMERAS; 10 |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|
108 | 108 | | (3) SMART PHONE APPLICATIONS AIMED AT REPORTING I NCIDENTS 11 |
---|
109 | 109 | | TO LOCAL LAW ENFORCE MENT; 12 |
---|
110 | 110 | | |
---|
111 | 111 | | (4) EMERGENCY BLUE LIGHTS; AND 13 |
---|
112 | 112 | | |
---|
113 | 113 | | (5) POTENTIAL METHODS FOR THE OCCU PANT OF AN ELECTRIC 14 |
---|
114 | 114 | | VEHICLE TO SAFELY DI SCONNECT FROM A CHAR GING STATION WITHOUT HAVING TO 15 |
---|
115 | 115 | | EXIT THE VEHICLE . 16 |
---|
116 | 116 | | |
---|
117 | 117 | | (I) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 31, 2025, AND EACH DECEMBER 31 17 |
---|
118 | 118 | | THEREAFTER , THE COMMISSION SHALL SUBM IT RECOMMENDATIONS T O THE 18 |
---|
119 | 119 | | GENERAL ASSEMBLY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT 19 |
---|
120 | 120 | | ARTICLE. 20 |
---|
121 | 121 | | |
---|
122 | 122 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the terms of the initial 21 |
---|
123 | 123 | | members of the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission shall expire as 22 |
---|
124 | 124 | | follows: 23 |
---|
125 | 125 | | |
---|
126 | 126 | | (1) one member in 2025; 24 |
---|
127 | 127 | | |
---|
128 | 128 | | (2) two members in 2026; and 25 |
---|
129 | 129 | | |
---|
130 | 130 | | (3) two members in 2027. 26 |
---|
131 | 131 | | |
---|
132 | 132 | | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 27 |
---|
133 | 133 | | October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 10 years and 3 months and, at the 28 |
---|
134 | 134 | | end of December 31, 2034, this Act, with no further action required by the General 29 |
---|
135 | 135 | | Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 30 |
---|