Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1428 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/09/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1428*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1428 
E4   	4lr2911 
      
By: Delegate Miller 
Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2024 
Assigned to: Judiciary 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Safety – Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission; 3 
and generally relating to the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission.  4 
 
BY adding to 5 
 Article – Public Safety 6 
Section 3–531 7 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 8 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 
 
Article – Public Safety 12 
 
3–531. 13 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “COMMISSION” MEANS THE ELECTRIC VEHICLE 14 
CHARGING STATION SAFETY COMMISSION. 15 
 
 (B) THERE IS AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING STATION SAFETY 16 
COMMISSION. 17 
 
 (C) THE PUR POSE OF THE COMMISSION IS TO DEVELOP POLICY 18 
RECOMMENDATIONS TO INCREASE SAFETY FOR VEHICLE O WNERS AND PASSENGERS 19 
AND REDUCE VIOLENT CRIME AND THEFT AT ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING 20 
STATIONS. 21 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1428  
 
 
 (D) THE COMMISSION CONSISTS O F THE FOLLOWING MEMBER S: 1 
 
 (1) THE SECRETARY OF STATE POLICE, OR THE SECRETARY’S 2 
DESIGNEE; 3 
 
 (2) THE SECRETARY OF JUVENILE SERVICES, OR THE SECRETARY’S 4 
DESIGNEE; 5 
 
 (3) THE SECRETARY OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL 6 
SERVICES, OR THE SECRETARY’S DESIGNEE;  7 
 
 (4) THE MOTOR VEHICLE ADMINISTRATOR ; AND 8 
 
 (5) THE FOLLOWING MEMBERS, APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR: 9 
 
 (I) TWO REPRESENTATIVE S OF LOCAL LAW ENFORCE MENT 10 
AGENCIES, INCLUDING ONE REPRES ENTATIVE OF A COUNTY SHERIFF’S OFFICE; AND 11 
 
 (II) THREE REPRESENTATIVES OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING ONE 12 
MEMBER WHO REPRESENT S A NEIGHBORHOOD OR COMM UNITY ASSOCIATION . 13 
 
 (E) (1) THE APPOINTED MEMBERS SERVE AT THE PLEASUR E OF THE 14 
GOVERNOR. 15 
 
 (2) THE TERM OF A N APPOINTED MEMBER IS 3 YEARS. 16 
 
 (3) THE TERMS OF THE APPOINTED MEMBERS ARE STAGGERE D AS 17 
REQUIRED IN THE TERM S PROVIDED FOR MEMBE RS OF THE COMMISSION ON 18 
OCTOBER 1, 2024. 19 
 
 (4) AT THE END OF A TERM , A MEMBER CONTINUES T O SERVE UNTIL 20 
A SUCCESSOR IS APPOI NTED AND QUALIFIES . 21 
 
 (5) A MEMBER WHO IS APPOIN TED AFTER A TERM HAS BEGUN SERVES 22 
ONLY FOR THE REST OF THE TERM AND UNTIL A SUCCESSOR IS APPOINT ED AND 23 
QUALIFIES. 24 
 
 (F) THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMISSION SHALL ELEC T ONE MEMBER TO 25 
SERVE AS CHAIR OF TH E COMMISSION. 26 
 
 (G) A MEMBER OF THE COMMISSION:  27 
   	HOUSE BILL 1428 	3 
 
 
 (1) MAY NOT RECEIVE COMPENSATION AS A ME MBER OF THE 1 
COMMISSION; BUT 2 
 
 (2) IS ENTITLED TO REIMB URSEMENT FOR EXPENSE S UNDER THE 3 
STANDARD STATE TRAVEL REGULATIONS, AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 4 
 
 (H) THE COMMISSION SHALL STUDY AND MAKE RECOM MENDATIONS ON 5 
METHODS OF INCREASIN G SAFETY FOR VEHICLE OWNERS AND PASSENGER S AND 6 
REDUCING VIOLENT CRIME AND THEFT AT ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING STATIONS , 7 
INCLUDING: 8 
 
 (1) IMPROVED LIGHTING; 9 
 
 (2) MONITORING BY SECURI TY CAMERAS; 10 
 
 (3) SMART PHONE APPLICATIONS AIMED AT REPORTING I NCIDENTS 11 
TO LOCAL LAW ENFORCE MENT; 12 
 
 (4) EMERGENCY BLUE LIGHTS; AND 13 
 
 (5) POTENTIAL METHODS FOR THE OCCU PANT OF AN ELECTRIC 14 
VEHICLE TO SAFELY DI SCONNECT FROM A CHAR GING STATION WITHOUT HAVING TO 15 
EXIT THE VEHICLE . 16 
 
 (I) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 31, 2025, AND EACH DECEMBER 31 17 
THEREAFTER , THE COMMISSION SHALL SUBM IT RECOMMENDATIONS T O THE 18 
GENERAL ASSEMBLY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT 19 
ARTICLE. 20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the terms of the initial 21 
members of the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Safety Commission shall expire as 22 
follows: 23 
 
 (1) one member in 2025; 24 
 
 (2) two members in 2026; and 25 
 
 (3) two members in 2027. 26 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 27 
October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 10 years and 3 months and, at the 28 
end of December 31, 2034, this Act, with no further action required by the General 29 
Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect.  30