House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (121-10) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {833724/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (124-8) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {533024/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |