Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1451 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 613
21
3-– 1 –
4-Chapter 613
5-(House Bill 1451)
62
7-AN ACT concerning
3+EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LA W.
4+ [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5+ Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6+ Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7+amendment.
8+ Italics indicate opposite chamber/conference committee amendments.
9+ *hb1451*
810
9-Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing
10-Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established
11+HOUSE BILL 1451
12+C8 (4lr3473)
13+ENROLLED BILL
14+— Appropriations/Finance —
15+Introduced by Delegate Embry
1116
12-FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really
13-Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup to
14-study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally
15-relating to the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing
16-Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup.
17+Read and Examined by Proofreaders:
1718
18- SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND,
19-That:
19+_______________________________________________
20+Proofreader.
21+_______________________________________________
22+Proofreader.
2023
21- (a) There is an Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really
22-Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art an Arts Incubator Workgroup.
24+Sealed with the Great Seal and presented to the Governor, for his approval this
2325
24- (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members:
26+_______ day of _______________ at _________________ _______ o’clock, ________M.
2527
26- (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate;
28+______________________________________________
29+Speaker.
2730
28- (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and
31+CHAPTER ______
2932
30- (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor:
33+AN ACT concerning 1
3134
32- (i) two three artists;
35+Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing 2
36+Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established 3
3337
34- (ii) one artist who is an arts educator;
38+FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really 4
39+Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup to 5
40+study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally 6
41+relating to the Arts Incubator Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really Emphasizing 7
42+Monetary Support Yielding More Art Arts Incubator Workgroup. 8
3543
36- (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an
37-audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people;
44+ SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9
45+That: 10
3846
39- (iv) two members of local arts councils;
47+ (a) There is an Arts Incubator The Jumpstarting Every Artist and Really 11
48+Emphasizing Monetary Support Yielding More Art an Arts Incubator Workgroup. 12
49+ 2 HOUSE BILL 1451
4050
41- (v) one member of the Maryland State Arts Council;
4251
43- (vi) two members of local arts districts, each from a different
44-geographical area of the State;
52+ (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 1
4553
46- (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an
47-audience of more than 250 people; and
54+ (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; 2
4855
49- (vi) (vii) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts. Ch. 613 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND
56+ (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and 3
5057
51-– 2 –
58+ (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 4
5259
53- (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the
54-members of the Workgroup.
60+ (i) two three artists; 5
5561
56- (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup.
62+ (ii) one artist who is an arts educator; 6
5763
58- (e) A member of the Workgroup:
64+ (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 7
65+audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; 8
5966
60- (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but
67+ (iv) two members of local arts councils; 9
6168
62- (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State
63-Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget.
69+ (v) one member of the Maryland State Arts Council; 10
6470
65- (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support
66-local artists.
71+ (vi) two members of local arts districts, each from a different 11
72+geographical area of the State; 12
6773
68- (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall
69-submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget,
70-facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists
71-findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support
72-artists in other areas to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State
73-Government Article, the General Assembly.
74+ (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 13
75+audience of more than 250 people; and 14
7476
75- (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report
76-on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that
77-are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with
78-§ 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly.
77+ (vi) (vii) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts. 15
7978
80- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July
81-1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of
82-December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall
83-be abrogated and of no further force and effect.
79+ (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the 16
80+members of the Workgroup. 17
8481
85-Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024.
82+ (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 18
83+
84+ (e) A member of the Workgroup: 19
85+
86+ (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 20
87+
88+ (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 21
89+Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 22
90+
91+ (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support 23
92+local artists. 24
93+
94+ (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall 25
95+submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, 26
96+facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists 27
97+findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support 28 HOUSE BILL 1451 3
98+
99+
100+artists in other areas to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 1
101+Government Article, the General Assembly. 2
102+
103+ (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 3
104+on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that 4
105+are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with 5
106+§ 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 6
107+
108+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHE R ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 7
109+1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of 8
110+December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 9
111+be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 10
112+
113+
114+
115+Approved:
116+________________________________________________________________________________
117+ Governor.
118+________________________________________________________________________________
119+ Speaker of the House of Delegates.
120+________________________________________________________________________________
121+ President of the Senate.